EP1462269 - Ink-jet printing system with a detachable carriage and manufacturing method therefore [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/40] | A method and apparatus for image forming using an ink-jet printing system with a detachable carriage | ||
[2007/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2008 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/45] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | ||
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | ||
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states Ricoh Company 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawashima, Yasuhiro c/o Ricoh Co., Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2004/40] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte P.O. Box 860245 81629 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04005017.1 | 03.03.2004 | [2004/40] | Priority number, date | JP20030086685 | 27.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003086685 | [2004/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1462269 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1462269 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | [2004/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1462269 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B41J25/34 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
B41J29/02 (EP,US);
B41J25/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2005/24] |
Former [2004/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Tintenstrahldrucksystem mit abnehmbarem Druckwagen und sein Herstellungsverfahren | [2007/19] | English: | Ink-jet printing system with a detachable carriage and manufacturing method therefore | [2007/19] | French: | Système d'impression à jet d'encre avec un chariot détachable et son procédé de fabrication | [2007/19] |
Former [2004/40] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bilderzeugung unter Verwendung eines Tintenstrahldrucksystems mit abnehmbarem Druckwagen | ||
Former [2004/40] | A method and apparatus for image forming using an ink-jet printing system with a detachable carriage | ||
Former [2004/40] | Méthode et appareil de production d'images utilisant un système d'impression à jet d'encre avec un chariot détachable | Examination procedure | 14.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 30.03.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.07.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.05.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.05.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 07.11.2007 | ES | 18.02.2008 | IT | 31.03.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2008/24] | NL | 07.11.2007 | |
ES | 18.02.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4446790 (KONKEL JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * column 6, line 59 - column 7, line 3 *; | [A]US4468144 (MCMAHON RONALD G [US], et al) [A] 1-19* column 2, lines 18-32 *; | [A]US5805183 (LIDKE STEVEN L [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * column 8, lines 25-65 * * column 18, line 33 - column 19, line 23 *; | [A]US5907343 (TAKEMURA MAKOTO [JP], et al) [A] 1-19 * column 6, lines 31-52 * * column 8, line 55 - column 9, line 9 * * figure 6 *; | [A]US2003016271 (MAKI TADASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0048] - [0051] * |