EP1455398 - Light emitting device comprising a phosphor layer and method of making same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYODA GOSEI CO., LTD. 1, Aza-Nagahata, Oaza Ochiai, Haruhi-cho Nishi-Kasugai-gun Aichi-ken, 452-8564 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/37] | For all designated states Toyoda Gosei Co., Ltd. 1, Aza-Nagahata, Oaza Ochiai, Haruhi-cho Nishikasugai-gun, Aichi-ken, 452-8564 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suehiro, Yoshinobu c/o Toyoda Gosei Co., Ltd. 1, Aza Nagahata Oaza Ochiai Haruhi-cho Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken, 452-8564 / JP | 02 /
Inoue, Mitsuhiro c/o Toyoda Gosei Co., Ltd. 1, Aza Nagahata Oaza Ochiai Haruhi-cho Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken, 452-8564 / JP | 03 /
Kato, Hideaki c/o Toyoda Gosei Co., Ltd. 1, Aza Nagahata Oaza Ochiai Haruhi-cho Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken, 452-8564 / JP | [2004/37] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/33] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/37] | Vollnhals, Aurel Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04005022.1 | 03.03.2004 | [2004/37] | Priority number, date | JP20030055851 | 03.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003055851 | JP20030069290 | 14.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003069290 | [2004/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1455398 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1455398 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | [2011/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00, H01L33/58, // H01L33/60 | [2011/03] | CPC: |
H01L33/507 (EP,US);
H01L33/58 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48257 (EP,US);
H01L2224/8592 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181 (EP,US);
H01L33/60 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/181, H01L2924/00012 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/37] | H01L33/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Licht emittierende Vorrichtung mit Leuchtstoffschicht und dessen Herstellungsverfahren | [2004/37] | English: | Light emitting device comprising a phosphor layer and method of making same | [2004/37] | French: | Dispositif électroluminescent avec un coche phosphorique et son procédé de fabrication | [2004/37] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 31.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5043716 (LATZ WILLIAM J [US], et al) [A] 7 * column 3, lines 9-14; figure 3 *; | [A]US5130761 (TANAKA TOSHIAKI [JP]) [A] 7 * column 4, lines 28-30; figure 1b *; | [X]JPH07193281 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0006] - [0011]; figure 1 *; | [AD]US5959316 (LOWERY CHRISTOPHER HAYDN [US]) [AD] 1,7 * column 2, lines 4-21; figure 1 * * column 2, lines 33-45; figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]EP1081771 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1,2,5 * paragraphs [0032] - [0034] - [0042]; figures 2,3,5 *; | [A]EP1160883 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,5,6 * paragraphs [0029] - [0063]; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US2002015013 (RAGLE LARRY [US]) [A] 8 * paragraph [0027]; figure 4 *; | [A]US6472765 (SANO TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 8 * column 5, lines 49-51; figure 1 * * column 6, lines 8-14 *; | [A]JP2002335019 (NICHIA KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [A] 10 * paragraphs [0002] - [0005]; figure 4 * * paragraphs [0015] - [0021] - [0 30] - [0032]; figures 1,3A-F, 6-8 *; | [XI]WO03010832 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * page 2, line 7 - page 3, line 13 * * page 4, lines 9-28 * * page 5, lines 20-24 * * page 6, lines 17-26 * * page 8, line 6 - page 9, line 28; figures 1-3 * * page 11, lines 12-17; figure 6 * * page 14, lines 1-9; figures 14,15 * * page 14, line 20 - page 15, line 2; figures 18,19 * [I] 5-11; | [E]EP1418628 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [E] 1-11 * paragraphs [0005] - [0009] - [0014] - [0017] - [0022] , [0026] , [0028] - [0031] - [0037]; figures 1-3,6 ** paragraphs [0047] , [0049]; figures 14,15,18,19 * |