EP1495977 - Surface pasteurization method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alkar-RapidPak, Inc. 932 Development Drive Lodi Wisconsin 53555 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states Alkar-RapidPak, Inc 932 Development Drive Lodi Wisconsin 53555 / US | ||
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states Alkar-RapidPak, Inc 932 Development Drive Lodi, Wisconsin 53555 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaman, Vernon D. N.4344 Highway 51 Poynette, WI 53955 / US | 02 /
Hahn, Gary Lee 927 Crescent Circle Sun Prairie, WI 53590 / US | 03 /
Bonneville, Craig R. 9530 Blackberry Road Black Earth, WI 53515 / US | 04 /
Vang, Ton T. 704 Russell Street Deforest, WI 53532 / US | 05 /
Feze, Nelly 4715 Sheboygan Avenue, Apart. 306 Madison, WI 53705 / US | 06 /
Hanson, Robert E. 6918 Frank Lloyd Wright Avenue Middleton, WI 53562 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [2005/02] | 01 /
Kaman, Vernon D. N.4344 Highway 51 Poynette, WI 53955 / US | ||
02 /
Hahn, Gary Lee 927 Crescent Circle Sun Prairie, WI 53590 / US | |||
03 /
Bonneville, Craig R. 9530 Blackberry Road Black Earth, WI 53515 / US | |||
04 /
Vang, Ton T. 704 Russell Street Deforest, WI 53532 / US | |||
05 /
Feze, Nelly 4715 Sheboygan Avenue, Apart. #306 Madison, WI 53705 / US | |||
06 /
Hanson, Robert E. 6918 Frank Lloyd Wright Avenue Middleton, WI 53562 / US | Representative(s) | Gesthuysen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Huyssenallee 68 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Huyssenallee 100 45128 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04005044.5 | 04.03.2004 | [2005/02] | Priority number, date | US20030614962 | 08.07.2003 Original published format: US 614962 | [2005/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1495977 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1495977 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65B55/14, B65B9/04, B65B25/06 | [2005/02] | CPC: |
B65B25/041 (EP,US);
A23B4/0053 (EP,US);
A23L3/185 (EP,US);
B65B25/062 (EP,US);
B65B25/067 (EP,US);
B65B55/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Pasteurisation von Oberflächen | [2005/02] | English: | Surface pasteurization method | [2005/02] | French: | Procédé de pasteurisation de surface | [2005/02] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 25.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.06.2007 | BE | 27.06.2007 | CH | 27.06.2007 | CY | 27.06.2007 | CZ | 27.06.2007 | EE | 27.06.2007 | FI | 27.06.2007 | LI | 27.06.2007 | NL | 27.06.2007 | PL | 27.06.2007 | RO | 27.06.2007 | SI | 27.06.2007 | SK | 27.06.2007 | TR | 27.06.2007 | BG | 27.09.2007 | SE | 27.09.2007 | GR | 28.09.2007 | PT | 27.11.2007 | HU | 28.12.2007 | FR | 22.02.2008 | IE | 04.03.2008 | LU | 04.03.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/34] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
BE | 27.06.2007 | ||
CH | 27.06.2007 | ||
CY | 27.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2007 | ||
EE | 27.06.2007 | ||
FI | 27.06.2007 | ||
LI | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
RO | 27.06.2007 | ||
SI | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
GR | 28.09.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
HU | 28.12.2007 | ||
FR | 22.02.2008 | ||
IE | 04.03.2008 | ||
LU | 04.03.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
BE | 27.06.2007 | ||
CH | 27.06.2007 | ||
CY | 27.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2007 | ||
EE | 27.06.2007 | ||
FI | 27.06.2007 | ||
LI | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
RO | 27.06.2007 | ||
SI | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
GR | 28.09.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
FR | 22.02.2008 | ||
IE | 04.03.2008 | ||
LU | 04.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
BE | 27.06.2007 | ||
CH | 27.06.2007 | ||
CY | 27.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2007 | ||
EE | 27.06.2007 | ||
FI | 27.06.2007 | ||
LI | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
RO | 27.06.2007 | ||
SI | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
GR | 28.09.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
FR | 22.02.2008 | ||
IE | 04.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
BE | 27.06.2007 | ||
CH | 27.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2007 | ||
EE | 27.06.2007 | ||
FI | 27.06.2007 | ||
LI | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
RO | 27.06.2007 | ||
SI | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
GR | 28.09.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
FR | 22.02.2008 | ||
IE | 04.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
BE | 27.06.2007 | ||
CH | 27.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2007 | ||
LI | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
RO | 27.06.2007 | ||
SI | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
GR | 28.09.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
FR | 22.02.2008 | ||
IE | 04.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/32] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
BE | 27.06.2007 | ||
CH | 27.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2007 | ||
LI | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
RO | 27.06.2007 | ||
SI | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
GR | 28.09.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
FR | 22.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
BE | 27.06.2007 | ||
CH | 27.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2007 | ||
LI | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
RO | 27.06.2007 | ||
SI | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
GR | 28.09.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
BE | 27.06.2007 | ||
CH | 27.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2007 | ||
LI | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SI | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
GR | 28.09.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
BE | 27.06.2007 | ||
CH | 27.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2007 | ||
LI | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SI | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
BE | 27.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SI | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
BE | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SI | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
BE | 27.06.2007 | ||
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SI | 27.06.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
BE | 27.06.2007 | ||
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 27.06.2007 | |
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | SE | 27.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3889009 (LIPOMA SAMUEL P) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0261929 (KEYES UK LTD [GB]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US5514403 (WEBB NEIL B [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [ED]EP1407968 (ALKAR RAPIDPAK INC [US]) [ED] 1-9,11-13,15-17 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5170611 | EP1407968 |