EP1455071 - Car start control apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2012 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2012 [2012/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/37] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hori, Toshio Hitachi Ltd. New Marunouchi Bldg. 1-5-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2004/37] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/35] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/26] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/37] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04005160.9 | 04.03.2004 | [2004/37] | Priority number, date | JP20030056477 | 04.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003056477 | [2004/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1455071 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1455071 | Date: | 30.11.2005 | [2005/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/02, F02D41/06, B60K31/04, F02D11/10 | [2005/48] | CPC: |
B60W30/18 (EP);
B60W10/02 (EP);
B60W10/04 (EP);
B60W10/06 (EP);
B60W30/18027 (EP);
B60W30/1819 (EP);
F02D11/105 (EP);
F02D41/0225 (EP);
F02D41/06 (EP);
B60W2510/0604 (EP);
B60W2510/0619 (EP);
B60W2510/0628 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2004/37] | F02D41/02, F02D41/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/31] |
Former [2004/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Anlasssteuerungsvorrichtung für einen Kraftwagen | [2004/37] | English: | Car start control apparatus | [2004/37] | French: | Dispositif pour commander le démarrage d'un véhicule | [2004/37] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/27] | 03.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/15] | 10.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.08.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.2009 | 31.03.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]JPH10220266 ; | [X]JPH11125128 ; | [X]JP2001082213 ; | [DA]JP2000145832 ; | [X]DE19632621 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-6,8,9,12,13,18 * column 1, line 43 - line 60 * * column 2, line 8 - column 3, line 25 * * figure . *; | [X]WO0150006 (SCANIA CV ABP [SE], et al) [X] 1-5,7-9,18 * page 2, line 22 - line 28 * * page 3, line 1 - line 6 * * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 20 * * page 5, line 18 - line 27 * * figure - * | [DX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19981130), vol. 1998, no. 13, & JP10220266 A 19980818 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [DX] 1-5,10,11,15-18 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990831), vol. 1999, no. 10, & JP11125128 A 19990511 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [X] 1-4,17,18 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010710), vol. 2000, no. 20, & JP2001082213 A 20010327 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [X] 1,3,4,8,9,17,18 * abstract * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001006), vol. 2000, no. 08, & JP2000145832 A 20000526 (EATON CORP) [DA] 1,5,6,12-16,18 * abstract * | Examination | US4881428 | EP0870917 | by applicant | JPH10220266 | JP2000145832 |