EP1460535 - Framework for supporting business software applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.10.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2004/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anonsen, Steven P. 72 N.Woodcrest Drive Fargo ND 58102 / US | 02 /
Brookins, Timothy James 1782 Princeton Lane West Fargo ND 58078 / US | [2004/39] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/39] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04005191.4 | 04.03.2004 | [2004/39] | Priority number, date | US20030389686 | 12.03.2003 Original published format: US 389686 | [2004/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1460535 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1460535 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44 | [2004/39] | CPC: |
G06F8/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/39] | Title | German: | Rahmwerk zur Unterstützung Geschäftssofwareanwendungen | [2004/39] | English: | Framework for supporting business software applications | [2004/39] | French: | Cadre pour supporter des applications logicielles de gestion. | [2004/39] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/33] | 16.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.05.2011 | 17.05.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/45] | 04.07.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.08.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - BENSON B H ET AL, "THE AT&T RHAPSODY BUSINESS ORCHESTRATION SOLUTION", AT & T TECHNOLOGY, AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH CO. SHORT HILLS, NEW JERSEY, US, (199001), vol. 5, no. 3, ISSN 0889-8979, pages 2 - 9, XP000177733 [X] 1-14 * the whole document * | [X] - NARC THOMAS SCHMIDT, "Building Workflow Business Objects", INTERNET CITATION, (19981012), pages 1 - 10, URL: http://jeffsutherland.org/oopsla98/mts.html, (20061120), XP002408119 [X] 1-14 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 16 * * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 23 * * page 5, line 23 - page 8, line 10 * |