EP1455359 - Method and apparatus for managing parental level of optical disc [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Youngdungpo-Gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/37] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yoido-Dong, Youngdungpo-ku Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Young Kuk C-502, Lg Kisook-sa 19-1, CHungho-ri Jinwee-myun Pyungtaek-si Kyunggi-do, 451-862 / KR | 02 /
Yun, Yeo Han 101-1103 Ajoo 2-cha Apt. Dokgok-dong Pyungtaek-si Kyunggi-do, 459-714 / KR | [2004/37] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/37] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04005305.0 | 05.03.2004 | [2004/37] | Priority number, date | KR20030013803 | 05.03.2003 Original published format: KR 2003013803 | KR20040013889 | 02.03.2004 Original published format: KR 2004013889 | [2004/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1455359 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1455359 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/10, G11B19/02, G11B20/00 | [2004/37] | CPC: |
G11B27/105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2005/26] |
Former [2004/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verwaltung eines elterlichen Niveaus einer optischen Platte | [2004/37] | English: | Method and apparatus for managing parental level of optical disc | [2004/37] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour gérer un niveau parental de disque optique | [2004/37] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 07.04.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.08.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/09] | 27.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.05.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.05.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | Examination | US6088007 | US2001037459 | WO03049347 |