EP1457164 - Structure for fixing an abutment to an implant, especially for dental applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corigliano, Massimo Via J.F. Kennedy, 98/c 00015 Monterotondo (Roma) / IT | [2004/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2004/38] | Representative(s) | Gustorf, Gerhard Bachstrasse 6a 84036 Landshut / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/38] | Gustorf, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Bachstrasse 6 A 84036 Landshut / DE | Application number, filing date | 04005372.0 | 06.03.2004 | [2004/38] | Priority number, date | IT2003PS00006 | 13.03.2003 Original published format: IT ps20030006 | [2004/38] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1457164 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1457164 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | [2005/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1457164 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00 | [2004/38] | CPC: |
A61C8/005 (EP);
A61C8/006 (EP);
A61C8/0069 (EP);
A61C8/0054 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/20] |
Former [2004/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Struktur zum Befestigen eines Abutments auf einem Implantat, insbesondere für zahnärztliche Anwendungen | [2004/38] | English: | Structure for fixing an abutment to an implant, especially for dental applications | [2004/38] | French: | Système de fixation d'un attachement sur un implant, en particulier pour des applications dentaires | [2004/38] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/39] | 14.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 06.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.05.2008 | BE | 14.05.2008 | CY | 14.05.2008 | CZ | 14.05.2008 | DK | 14.05.2008 | EE | 14.05.2008 | FI | 14.05.2008 | IT | 14.05.2008 | NL | 14.05.2008 | SI | 14.05.2008 | SK | 14.05.2008 | TR | 14.05.2008 | BG | 14.08.2008 | SE | 14.08.2008 | GR | 15.08.2008 | PT | 14.10.2008 | HU | 15.11.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
IT | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
GR | 15.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
HU | 15.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
IT | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
GR | 15.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
IT | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
BE | 14.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 14.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9701306 (BEATY KEITH D [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * page 7, lines 26-31 ** page 8, lines 4-11; figure 4 *; | [X]DE19647490 (HAFNER C GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-3 * column 2, lines 42-51 * * column 3, lines 15-18; figure 1 *; | [X]US5947733 (SUTTER FRANZ [CH], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 9, lines 53-58 * * column 10, lines 19-27 * * column 11, lines 6-13; figures 5,6A,7A *; | [X]WO0038588 (STRAUMANN INST AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 9, lines 13-31 * * page 10, lines 17-24; figures 1,2a *; | [X]US2001053512 (NICHINONNI GIANNI [AU]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0020] , [0021]; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | EP0895757 |