EP1454640 - Formulations of hyaluronic acid for delivery of osteogenic proteins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.10.2005 [2005/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genetics Institute, LLC 87 Cambridge Park Drive Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | For all designated states FIDIA ADVANCED BIOPOLYMERS S.R.L. Via Ponte della Fabbrica 3/B 35031 Abano Terme (Padova) / IT | [2004/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Hyun 262 Washington Street Boxford, MA 01921 / US | 02 /
Li, Rebecca 12 Shire Lane Bedford, MA 01921 / US | 03 /
Pavesio, Alessandra Via S. Gregorio Barbarigo, 93 35141 Padova / IT | 04 /
Callegaro, Lanfranco Via Monte Grappa, 6 36013 Thiene, Vicenza / IT | [2004/37] | Representative(s) | Helbig, Christian Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/37] | Helbig, Christian, Dr. Dipl.-Biol. Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04005617.8 | 13.10.2000 | [2004/37] | Priority number, date | US19990159674P | 15.10.1999 Original published format: US 159674 P | US20000185587P | 28.02.2000 Original published format: US 185587 P | [2004/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1454640 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1454640 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/22, A61L27/46, A61L27/20 | [2004/39] | CPC: |
A61K9/0024 (EP);
A61K38/1875 (EP);
A61K47/36 (EP);
A61L27/20 (EP);
A61L27/227 (EP);
A61L27/46 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K38/1875, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61L27/20, C08L5/08 (EP);
A61L27/46, C08L5/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/37] | A61L27/20, A61L27/22, A61L27/46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/37] | Title | German: | Formulierungen von Hyaluronsäure zur Freisetzung von osteogenen Proteinen | [2004/37] | English: | Formulations of hyaluronic acid for delivery of osteogenic proteins | [2004/37] | French: | Formulations d'acide hyaluronique pour la libération de protéines osteogéniques | [2004/37] | Examination procedure | 09.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 22.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/40] | 09.05.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/40] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00970914.8 / EP1223990 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9117777 (UNIV FLORIDA [US]) [Y] 1-16 * claim - *; | [A]WO9320858 (FIDIA SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-16* examples 1-6; claim - *; | [Y]WO9745532 (UNIV BROWN RES FOUND [US]) [Y] 1-16 * examples 1-6; claim - *; | [X]WO9749412 (FIDIA SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1,4-6,8 * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO9924070 (FIDIA ADVANCED BIOPOLYMERS SRL [IT], et al) [X] 1,4-6,8 * page 7, line 6 - line 27; claim - *; | [PX]WO0037124 (FIDIA ADVANCED BIOPOLYMERS SRL [IT], et al) [PX] 1,4-6,8 * claim - * |