EP1471651 - Method for extending the distortion free dynamic range of non-linear signal processing components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.02.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EADS Deutschland GmbH Willy-Messerschmitt-Strasse 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/44] | For all designated states EADS Deutschland GmbH Willy-Messerschmitt-Strasse 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gottscheber, Holger Pfarrer-Bosch-Weg 35 89160 Dornstadt / DE | [2004/44] | Representative(s) | Meel, Thomas c/o Dornier GmbH Patentabteilung 88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Meel, Thomas c/o Dornier GmbH Patentabteilung 88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | ||
Former [2004/44] | Meel, Thomas, Patentassessor c/o Dornier GmbH FCL6 88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04005741.6 | 11.03.2004 | [2004/44] | Priority number, date | DE2003118754 | 25.04.2003 Original published format: DE 10318754 | [2004/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1471651 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1471651 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | [2005/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/10 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
H04B1/28 (EP,US);
H04B1/1036 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/38] |
Former [2004/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Vergrösserung des störungsfreien Dynamikbereichs von nichtlinearen signalverarbeitenden Komponenten | [2004/44] | English: | Method for extending the distortion free dynamic range of non-linear signal processing components | [2004/44] | French: | Procédé d'extension de la plage dynamique sans perturbation pour des composants non-linéaires de traitement de signaux | [2004/44] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 09.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2006 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2007/12] | 17.10.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.11.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2007/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - DE FRANCO G, "A MATHEMATICAL MODEL FOR THE EVALUATION OF SPURIOUS RESPONSE INTERFERENCE IN A SUPERHETERODYNE RECEIVER", EUROPEAN TRANSACTIONS ON TELECOMMUNICATIONS AND RELATED TECHNOLOGIES, AEI, MILANO, IT, (19900501), vol. 1, no. 3, ISSN 1120-3862, pages 35 - 46, XP000164816 [A] 1 * page 35, column R, line 18 - page 36, column R, line 3 * * page 396 - page 398 * | [A] - HEATHER F W ED - INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "APPLICATION OF NOMOGRAPHS FOR ANALYSIS AND PREDICTION OF RECEIVER SPURIOUS RESPONSE EMI", INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON ELECTROMAGNETIC COMPATIBILITY. BOSTON, MASSACHUSETTS, AUGUST 20 - 22, 1985, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (198508), pages 390 - 398, XP000818733 [A] 1 * page 390, column R * * page 396 - page 398 * |