EP1473264 - Stop bar for creating a temporary safety space within an elevator hoistway [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.2013 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | For all designated states INVENTIO AG Seestrasse 55, Postfach 6052 Hergiswil / CH | ||
Former [2004/45] | For all designated states INVENTIO AG Seestrasse 55, Postfach CH-6052 Hergiswil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kocher, Johannes Sonnmatt 12 6044 Udligenswil / CH | 02 /
Mc Govern, Eamon Waldstätterstrasse 3 6003 Luzern / CH | [2004/45] | Application number, filing date | 04005745.7 | 11.03.2004 | [2004/45] | Priority number, date | EP20030405215 | 31.03.2003 Original published format: EP 03405215 | [2004/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1473264 | Date: | 03.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1473264 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B66B5/00, B66B11/02 | [2004/45] | CPC: |
B66B11/0246 (EP,US);
B26B13/04 (KR);
B66B5/0056 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/45] | Title | German: | Haltestab für die Kreation eines zeitlichen Sicherheitsraumes in einem Aufzugsschacht | [2004/45] | English: | Stop bar for creating a temporary safety space within an elevator hoistway | [2004/45] | French: | Barre d'arrêt pour créer une zone de sécurité temporelle dans une cage d'ascenseur | [2004/45] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/23] | 09.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.06.2006 | RO | 21.06.2006 | SI | 21.06.2006 | SK | 21.06.2006 | BG | 21.09.2006 | HU | 22.12.2006 | LU | 11.03.2007 | IE | 12.03.2007 | [2013/49] |
Former [2009/44] | CY | 21.06.2006 | |
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
HU | 22.12.2006 | ||
LU | 11.03.2007 | ||
IE | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2009/40] | CY | 21.06.2006 | |
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
LU | 11.03.2007 | ||
IE | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/31] | IT | 21.06.2006 | |
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
IE | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | IT | 21.06.2006 | |
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 12.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | IT | 21.06.2006 | |
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | SI | 21.06.2006 | |
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | SI | 21.06.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5773771 (CHATHAM CHARLES [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]EP0922663 (THYSSEN AUFZUEGE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,6* figure 5 * |