EP1574539 - Catalyst composition for producing polyethylene terephthalate from terephthalic acid and ethylene glycol, and process therefore [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.02.2008 Database last updated on 03.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saudi Basic Industries Corporation Inc. P.O. Box 5101 11422 Riyadh / SA | [2005/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bashir, Zahir P.O. Box 42503 11551 Riyadh / SA | 02 /
Siddiqui, Jamil P.O. Box 42503 11551 Riyadh / SA | 03 /
Sampath, Venkatanathan P.O. Box 42503 11551 Riyadh / SA | 04 /
Al Luhaidan, Khalid P.O. Box 42503 11551 Riyadh / SA | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Krijgsman, Willem SABIC Europe Corporate Patent Group P.O. Box 3008 6160 GA Geleen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/21] | Krijgsman, Willem SABIC Europe Patent Department P.O.Box 3008 6160 GA Geleen / NL | ||
Former [2005/37] | Winkler, Andreas Fritz Ernst FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04005822.4 | 11.03.2004 | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1574539 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1574539 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/86, C08G63/83, C08G63/80 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
C08G63/866 (EP,US);
C08F4/20 (KR);
C08G63/80 (EP,US);
C08G63/83 (EP,KR,US);
C08G63/85 (KR);
C08G63/86 (KR);
C08G63/183 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung vom Katalysator zur Herstellung von Polyethyleneterephthalat aus Terephthalsäure und Ethylenglykol und deren Verfahren | [2005/37] | English: | Catalyst composition for producing polyethylene terephthalate from terephthalic acid and ethylene glycol, and process therefore | [2005/37] | French: | Composition de catalyseur pour la production de polyéthylène téréphtalate à partir d'acide téréphtalique et d'éthylène glycol et procédé l'utilisant | [2005/37] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 10.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.04.2007 | BE | 25.04.2007 | CY | 25.04.2007 | CZ | 25.04.2007 | DK | 25.04.2007 | EE | 25.04.2007 | FI | 25.04.2007 | PL | 25.04.2007 | RO | 25.04.2007 | SI | 25.04.2007 | SK | 25.04.2007 | BG | 25.07.2007 | SE | 25.07.2007 | GR | 26.07.2007 | PT | 25.09.2007 | HU | 26.10.2007 | [2010/34] |
Former [2009/35] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
CY | 25.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
EE | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
PL | 25.04.2007 | ||
RO | 25.04.2007 | ||
SI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SK | 25.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.07.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
EE | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
PL | 25.04.2007 | ||
RO | 25.04.2007 | ||
SI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SK | 25.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.07.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
PL | 25.04.2007 | ||
RO | 25.04.2007 | ||
SI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SK | 25.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.07.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
PL | 25.04.2007 | ||
SI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SK | 25.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
GR | 26.07.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
PL | 25.04.2007 | ||
SI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SK | 25.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
PL | 25.04.2007 | ||
SI | 25.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
PL | 25.04.2007 | ||
SI | 25.04.2007 | ||
BG | 25.07.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
DK | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
PL | 25.04.2007 | ||
SI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
PL | 25.04.2007 | ||
SI | 25.04.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
BE | 25.04.2007 | ||
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
PL | 25.04.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 25.04.2007 | |
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
PL | 25.04.2007 | ||
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | FI | 25.04.2007 | |
SE | 25.07.2007 | ||
PT | 25.09.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH1121338 ; | [DA]US5166311 (NICHOLS CARL S [US]) [DA] 1-16 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 22 *; | [A]US5340906 (SHIROKURA YUKIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 12 * * column 4, line 59 - line 65 * * column 5, line 39 - line 47 * * column 5, line 59 - column 6, line 2 * * example -; claim - *; | [X]US5608031 (YAU CHEUK C [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 26 - line 62 * * column 3, line 12 - line 18 * * column 4, line 1 - line 28 * * column 5, line 42 - column 6, line 1 * * column 6, line 19 - line 21 * * example 2; claims 26,37 *; | [DX]US5623047 (YUO WU-BIN [TW], et al) [DX] 1-16 * column 3, line 19 - line 56 * * claim - *; | [A]US6160085 (FUJIMORI YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 14, Database accession no. 1999-163247, XP002318124 & JPH1121338 A 19990126 (TEIJIN LTD) [X] 1-4 * abstract * |