EP1429472 - Wireless communication apparatus and transmission power control method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2009 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2008/26] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2004/25] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ichikawa, Yasufumi 1-62, Futamatagawa Asahi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 241-0821 / JP | [2004/25] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/25] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04005828.1 | 16.01.2001 | [2004/25] | Priority number, date | JP20000029167 | 07.02.2000 Original published format: JP 2000029167 | [2004/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1429472 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1429472 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | [2006/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1429472 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/005, H03G3/30 | [2004/25] | CPC: |
H04W52/265 (EP,US);
H03G3/3042 (EP,US);
H04W52/267 (EP,US);
H04W52/36 (EP,US);
H04W52/367 (EP,US);
H04W52/60 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, NL, SE [2004/25] | Title | German: | Schnurloses Kommunikationsgerät und Verfahren zur Leistungsregelung dafür | [2004/25] | English: | Wireless communication apparatus and transmission power control method thereof | [2004/25] | French: | Appareil de communication sans fil et procédé de commande de la puissance associé | [2004/25] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 28.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 09.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01100904.0 / EP1122892 | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/23] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 09.05.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 09.05.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.05.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 25.06.2008 | NL | 25.06.2008 | SE | 25.09.2008 | FR | 02.02.2009 | [2010/21] |
Former [2009/07] | FI | 25.06.2008 | |
NL | 25.06.2008 | ||
SE | 25.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/01] | FI | 25.06.2008 | |
NL | 25.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | FI | 25.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0675605 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1,6* abstract *; column 1, line 32 - column 2, line 57 *; | [X]US5852770 (KASAMATSU HIDEKI [JP]) [X] 1,6 * abstract *; column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 6 * * column 3, line 55 - line 63 * * column 5, line 21 - line 53 * * column 6, line 13 - line 26 * * column 10, line 27 - column 11, line 24 * * figures 2-4,9; claims 1-4 *; | [A]US5974093 (LEE SANG-KEUN [KR]) [A] 1,6 * abstract *; column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 16 * * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 8 * * figure 1 * |