EP1462149 - Use of phenazon for the treatment of migraine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/40] | Medicament for the treatment of migraine based on phenazon | ||
[2007/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krewel Meuselbach GmbH Krewelstrasse 2 53783 Eitorf / DE | [2004/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schierstedt, Detlev, Dr. Henri-Dunant-Strasse 2 53757 St. Augustin / DE | [2009/52] |
Former [2004/40] | 01 /
Schierstedt, Dieter, Dr. Henri-Dunant-Strasse 2 53757 St. Augustin / DE | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Jönsson, Hans-Peter, Dr.Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus am Dom) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 04006037.8 | 13.03.2004 | [2004/40] | Priority number, date | DE2003113446 | 26.03.2003 Original published format: DE 10313446 | [2004/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1462149 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1462149 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61P29/00, A61K31/4152, A61K9/20 | [2007/47] | CPC: |
A61K9/2027 (EP);
A61K31/4152 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2004/40] | A61P29/00, A61K31/4152, A61K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/40] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Phenazon zur Behandlung von Migräne | [2007/47] | English: | Use of phenazon for the treatment of migraine | [2007/47] | French: | Utilisation du phenazon pour le traitement du migraine | [2007/47] |
Former [2004/40] | Phenazon-haltiges Migränemedikament | ||
Former [2004/40] | Medicament for the treatment of migraine based on phenazon | ||
Former [2004/40] | Médicamment pour traiter migraine contenant du phenazon | Examination procedure | 18.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/12] | 11.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.05.2008 | DK | 07.05.2008 | EE | 07.05.2008 | FI | 07.05.2008 | IE | 07.05.2008 | NL | 07.05.2008 | RO | 07.05.2008 | SI | 07.05.2008 | SK | 07.05.2008 | TR | 07.05.2008 | BG | 07.08.2008 | SE | 07.08.2008 | GR | 08.08.2008 | ES | 18.08.2008 | PT | 07.10.2008 | HU | 08.11.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | DK | 07.05.2008 | |
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
GR | 08.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
HU | 08.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/49] | DK | 07.05.2008 | |
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
GR | 08.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | DK | 07.05.2008 | |
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
BG | 07.08.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | DK | 07.05.2008 | |
EE | 07.05.2008 | ||
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/16] | DK | 07.05.2008 | |
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
RO | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SK | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | DK | 07.05.2008 | |
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
PT | 07.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | DK | 07.05.2008 | |
FI | 07.05.2008 | ||
IE | 07.05.2008 | ||
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 07.05.2008 | |
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
SE | 07.08.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | FI | 07.05.2008 | |
NL | 07.05.2008 | ||
SI | 07.05.2008 | ||
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | SI | 07.05.2008 | |
ES | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 07.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0876141 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-7,9-11 * page 2, lines 42-49 * * page 3, lines 9-11 * * page 4, lines 39-42; claim 1 *; | [X] - VOIGT, R. ET AL., "Beiträge zur Erhöhung der Liberationsgeschwindigkeit von Propyphenazon aus peroralen festen Arzneiformen", DIE PHARMAZIE, (198501), vol. 40, no. 1, pages 39 - 44, XP001189632 [X] 1-7,9-11 * abstract * * page 40, column R, paragraph 5 * |