EP1462294 - Method of displaying various image data on a display in a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2006 [2006/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [2004/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eggers, Helmuth, Dr.-Ing. Einsteinstrasse 17/1 89077 Ulm / DE | 02 /
Kurz, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Panoramastrasse 19 73240 Wendlingen / DE | 03 /
Seekircher, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Gartenstrasse 39 73760 Ostfildern / DE | 04 /
Wohlgemuth, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. Teckstrasse 2 72631 Aichtal / DE | [2004/40] | Application number, filing date | 04006059.2 | 15.03.2004 | [2004/40] | Priority number, date | DE2003113001 | 24.03.2003 Original published format: DE 10313001 | [2004/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1462294 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60K35/00, G07C5/08, G01C21/36, G08G1/0962 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
G08G1/0969 (EP,US);
D21H21/54 (KR);
B60K35/00 (EP,US);
B65D81/28 (KR);
D21H21/14 (KR);
D21H21/36 (KR);
D21H21/38 (KR);
D21H27/10 (KR);
G01C21/3632 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/24] |
Former [2004/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Abbildung unterschiedlicher Bilddaten auf einem Fahrzeugdisplay | [2004/40] | English: | Method of displaying various image data on a display in a vehicle | [2004/40] | French: | Procédé pour afficher des données d'image sur un écran dans un véhicule | [2004/40] | Examination procedure | 24.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/43] | 17.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/44] | 14.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11120491 ; | [X]US5121112 (NAKADOZONO HIROSHI [JP]) [X] 1-5,7 * column 2, line 49 - column 3, line 25 * * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 7 * * abstract *; | [X]EP0771686 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8 * column 4, line 10 - column 10, line 28 * * abstract *; | [X]US5757268 (TOFFOLO DANIEL [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 4, line 22 - column 5, line 25 * * column 6, line 4 - column 7, line 58 * * column 8, line 36 - column 9, line 14 * * abstract *; | [X]EP1080976 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-8 * column 3, line 19 - column 5, line 40 * * figures 1-10 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990730), vol. 1999, no. 09, & JP11120491 A 19990430 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * abstract * |