Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004219060 | Global Dossier | 04.11.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20030647 | 01.04.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4450659B | Global Dossier | 14.04.2010 | B2 | JP2004305738 | 04.11.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | ITMI20030647 | 01.04.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1464350 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20030647 | 01.04.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ITMI20030647 | 02.10.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITMI20030647 | 01.04.2003 |