EP1464350 - Device and methods for processing blood in extracorporeal circulation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sorin Group Italia S.r.l. Via Benigno Crespi 17 20159 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/30] | For all designated states SORIN GROUP ITALIA S.R.L. Via Benigno Crespi 17 20159 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2006/08] | For all designated states SORIN GROUP ITALIA S.R.L. Via Borgonuovo 14 20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states DIDECO S.r.l. Via Statale 12 Nord, 86 I-41037 Mirandola (Province of Modena) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Costa Maianti, Edgardo Via C. Cellini, 17 41037 Mirandola (Prov. of Modena) / IT | 02 /
Ghelli, Nicola Via Matteotti, 293 (Prov. of Bologna) 40018 San Pietro in Casale / IT | 03 /
Panzani, Ivo ViaTagliamento, 11 41037 Mirandola (Prov. of Modena) / IT | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati S.p.A. Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2004/41] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati, Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 04006207.7 | 16.03.2004 | [2004/41] | Priority number, date | IT2003MI00647 | 01.04.2003 Original published format: IT MI20030647 | [2004/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1464350 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/36, A61M1/16 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
A61M1/3627 (EP,US);
A61M1/1698 (EP,US);
A61M1/3606 (EP,US);
A61M1/3623 (EP,US);
A61M1/3666 (EP,US);
A61M1/3667 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2005/26] |
Former [2004/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Blutbehandlung in extrakorporalen Kreisläufen | [2004/41] | English: | Device and methods for processing blood in extracorporeal circulation | [2004/41] | French: | Dispositif et méthode de traitement de sang dans des circuits extracorporels | [2004/41] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/19] | 07.04.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.08.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/42] | 31.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.12.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.05.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0724889 (DIDECO SPA [IT]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 5, line 38 * * column 6, line 18 - line 35; figure 5 * * column 8, line 33 - line 35 * * column 8, line 53 - line 55 * * column 9, line 2 - line 5 *; | [X]US5770149 (RAIBLE DONALD A [US]) [X] 1-6 * column 5, line 19 - line 24 * * column 10, line 39 - line 62 * * column 12, line 9 - line 11 * * column 12, line 55 - line 59 * * figures 8,9A,9 *; | [A]EP0987035 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [A] 1,4 * paragraph [0165]; figure 10 *; | [DA]EP1180374 (DIDECO SPA [IT]) [DA] 1,4* the whole document *; | [A]EP1197235 (MERCE VIVES SALVADOR [ES]) [A] 1,4 * abstract *; | [A]US6503450 (AFZAL THOMAS A [US], et al) [A] 3,6 * paragraphs [0072] , [0074]; figures 8A,B,10 *; | [PX]EP1382358 (DIDECO SPA [IT]) [PX] 1,2,4,5 * paragraphs [0016] - [0018]; figures 4,5 * | by applicant | EP1118731 |