Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1465064
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
10.06.2011 |
Refusal of application |
published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] |
29.04.2011 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
22.02.2011 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
22.02.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
26.11.2010 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
18.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.11.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.11.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.05.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.03.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.03.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.02.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.09.2006 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 11.10.2006 [2006/41] |
01.09.2006 |
First examination report |
|
30.08.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.08.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] |
16.03.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.12.2005 |
Publication of search report |
published on 08.02.2006 [2006/06] |
20.08.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] |