EP1465064 - Operating system deployment methods and systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Refusal of application | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sardesai, Shantanu 605 235th Ave NE Sammamish Washington 98074 / US | 02 /
Khan, Shafqat U. 4850 156th Avenue NE Apt. 87 Redmond Washington 98052 / US | 03 /
Kumar, Deepak 11125 115th Ave NE Kirkland Washington 98033 / US | 04 /
Parupudi, Gopal 4221 255th PI SE Issaquah Washington 98029 / US | 05 /
Deo, Vinay 16302 NE 50th Way Redmond Washington 98052 / US | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04006268.9 | 16.03.2004 | [2004/41] | Priority number, date | US20030455830P | 18.03.2003 Original published format: US 455830 P | US20030667123 | 17.09.2003 Original published format: US 667123 | [2004/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1465064 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1465064 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
G06F8/60 (EP,US);
G06F15/16 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/41] | Title | German: | Betriebssystemeinsatzverfahren und -Systeme | [2004/41] | English: | Operating system deployment methods and systems | [2004/41] | French: | Méthodes et systèmes de déploiement des systèmes d'exploitation | [2004/41] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 01.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.03.2011 | 28.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/28] | 02.03.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.03.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.09.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0068836 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 25-34 * page 14, line 6 - page 15, line 8 * * page 8, line 20 - page 13, line 10 *; | [A]US6345386 (DELO JOHN C [US], et al) [A] 38 * the whole document *; | [X]WO02073448 (POWERQUEST CORP [US]) [X] 1-24,50-76 * abstract * * the whole document * * page 12, line 12 - page 16, line 18; figure 3 *; | [X] - WOLFRAM OESTREICHER, "WinPE - ein bootfähiges "Mini" - Windows XP", (20030304), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://www-pc.uni-regensburg.de/systemsw/WinXP/winpe.htm, (20050602), XP002330635 [X] 18,36 * the whole document * | [X] - NETSUPPORT GMBH, "Netinstall 5.5", NETINSTALL 5.5 USER GUIDE, (2002), pages 21 - 35, XP002284204 [X] 35-49 * pages 21-35 * | [A] - MICROSOFT PRESS, SCHOONHOVEN, ACADAMIC SERVICE SCHOONHOVEN, (20010101), ISBN 9039514739, XP002330637 [A] 1-76 * paragraph [5.6.4] * * figure 5.7 * | by applicant | WO02073448 |