EP1471109 - Composition containing an oxalic acid dialkyl ester and a sterically hindered carbodiimide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2004/44] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schütte, Markus, Dr. Kiwittstrasse 34 d 49074 Osnabrück / DE | 02 /
Kreyenschmidt, Martin, Dr. Corveystrasse 22 49393 Lohne / DE | 03 /
Häberle, Karl, Dr. Allerheiligenstrasse 15 67346 Speyer / DE | [2004/44] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/33] | Application number, filing date | 04006347.1 | 17.03.2004 | [2004/44] | Priority number, date | DE2003118282 | 22.04.2003 Original published format: DE 10318282 | [2004/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1471109 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1471109 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/00, C08G18/00 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
C08G18/797 (EP);
C08G18/10 (EP);
C08G18/341 (EP);
C08G2110/0033 (EP);
C08G2110/0066 (EP);
C08G2110/0083 (EP);
C08G2410/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/44] | Title | German: | Mittel, enthaltend Oxalsäuredialkylester und sterisch gehindertes Carbodiimid | [2004/44] | English: | Composition containing an oxalic acid dialkyl ester and a sterically hindered carbodiimide | [2004/44] | French: | Composition contenant un ester dialcoylique de l'acide oxalique et un carbodiimide à empêchement stérique | [2004/44] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 11.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.03.2004 | CY | 15.08.2012 | CZ | 15.08.2012 | DK | 15.08.2012 | EE | 15.08.2012 | FI | 15.08.2012 | NL | 15.08.2012 | PL | 15.08.2012 | RO | 15.08.2012 | SE | 15.08.2012 | SI | 15.08.2012 | SK | 15.08.2012 | TR | 15.08.2012 | BG | 15.11.2012 | GR | 16.11.2012 | PT | 17.12.2012 | AT | 17.03.2013 | IE | 17.03.2013 | LU | 17.03.2013 | BE | 31.03.2013 | CH | 31.03.2013 | LI | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
TR | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
AT | 17.03.2013 | ||
IE | 17.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
AT | 17.03.2013 | ||
IE | 17.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
IE | 17.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
IE | 17.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 15.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0032011 (ICI PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 12 * * page 4, line 28 - page 5, line 8 * * page 8, line 1 - line 20 ** page 10, line 1 - line 12; claims 1-8 *; | [DY]DE4238046 (BASF AG [DE]) [DY] 1-10 * page 6, line 11 - line 37; claims 1-7 *; | [DY]EP0628541 (BASF AG [DE]) [DY] 1-10 * page 5, line 35 - page 6, line 13; claims 1-10 *; | [DY]DE10063497 (BAYER AG [DE]) [DY] 1-10 * page 5, line 22 - line 34; claims 1-4 * |