EP1582559 - Rubber composition for tire tread [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Reifen Deutschland GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2010/02] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states Continental Aktiengesellschaft Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kleffmann, Jens Rotermundstrasse 24a 30165 Hannover / DE | 02 /
Thielemann, Klaus Grotefendweg 7 31137 Hildesheim / DE | 03 /
Neddenriep, Thomas Parkweg 8a 29690 Schwarmstedt / DE | 04 /
Topp, Andreas Priessallee 5 33604 Bielefeld / DE | [2005/40] | Representative(s) | Finger, Karsten, et al Continental Aktiengesellschaft Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 169 30001 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | Finger, Karsten, et al Continental Aktiengesellschaft Patente und Lizenzen Postfach 1 69 30001 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 04006760.5 | 20.03.2004 | [2005/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1582559 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1582559 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/04, C08L21/00, C08L7/00 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
C08K3/04 (EP);
B29B7/7495 (EP);
B60C1/0016 (EP);
C08L21/00 (EP);
C08L7/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L21/00, C08L2666/08 (EP);
C08L7/00, C08K3/04, C08L21/00 (EP);
C08K3/04, C08L21/00 (EP);
C08K3/04, C08L7/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/40] | Title | German: | Kautschukmischung für Laufstreifen von Reifen | [2005/40] | English: | Rubber composition for tire tread | [2005/40] | French: | Composition de caoutchouc pour bande de roulement pneumatique | [2005/40] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/40] | 15.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.03.2004 | CY | 11.05.2011 | CZ | 11.05.2011 | DK | 11.05.2011 | EE | 11.05.2011 | FI | 11.05.2011 | IE | 11.05.2011 | IT | 11.05.2011 | NL | 11.05.2011 | PL | 11.05.2011 | RO | 11.05.2011 | SE | 11.05.2011 | SI | 11.05.2011 | SK | 11.05.2011 | TR | 11.05.2011 | BG | 11.08.2011 | GR | 12.08.2011 | ES | 22.08.2011 | PT | 12.09.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
TR | 11.05.2011 | ||
BG | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
BG | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
IT | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | PT | 12.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1031441 (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * page 6, line 23 - line 40 ** examples 3,4; table 1 *; | [A]KR20030020147 (KUMHO IND CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]WO2004013222 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * |