EP1467050 - Lock module for a motor vehicle door [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kiekert Aktiengesellschaft Kettwiger Strasse 12-24 42579 Heiligenhaus / DE | [2004/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Becker, Arne Hilfswerkstrasse 28 47138 Duisburg / DE | 02 /
Serbetci, Selcuk Hessenstrasse 4 40883 Ratingen / DE | [2004/42] | Application number, filing date | 04006779.5 | 20.03.2004 | [2004/42] | Priority number, date | DE2003114839 | 01.04.2003 Original published format: DE 10314839 | [2004/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1467050 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1467050 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | [2005/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1467050 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/20 | [2004/42] | CPC: |
B60J5/0433 (EP);
E05B79/04 (EP);
E05B79/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/39] |
Former [2006/33] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2004/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schlossmodul für eine Kraftfahrzeugtür | [2004/42] | English: | Lock module for a motor vehicle door | [2004/42] | French: | Module de serrure pour portière de véhicule automobile | [2004/42] | Examination procedure | 10.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/39] | 14.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.07.2006 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   10.08.2006 | 25.07.2006 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   10.08.2006 | 25.07.2006 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   10.08.2006 | 25.07.2006 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   10.08.2006 | 25.07.2006 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   10.08.2006 | 25.07.2006 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   10.08.2006 | 25.07.2006 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   10.08.2006 | 25.07.2006 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   10.08.2006 | 25.07.2006 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   10.08.2006 | 25.07.2006 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   10.08.2006 | 25.07.2006 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   10.08.2006 | 25.07.2006 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   10.08.2006 | 25.07.2006 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   10.08.2006 | 25.07.2006 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   10.08.2006 | 25.07.2006 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   10.08.2006 | 25.07.2006 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   10.08.2006 | 25.07.2006 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   10.08.2006 | 25.07.2006 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   10.08.2006 | 25.07.2006 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   10.08.2006 | 25.07.2006 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   10.08.2006 | 25.07.2006 | PL   M01   Fee paid on   10.08.2006 | 25.07.2006 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   10.08.2006 | 25.07.2006 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   10.08.2006 | 25.07.2006 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   10.08.2006 | 25.07.2006 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   10.08.2006 | 25.07.2006 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   10.08.2006 | 25.07.2006 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   10.08.2006 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.07.2006 | M01   Fee paid on   10.08.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.02.2010 | CZ | 17.02.2010 | DK | 17.02.2010 | EE | 17.02.2010 | FI | 17.02.2010 | IE | 17.02.2010 | IT | 17.02.2010 | NL | 17.02.2010 | PL | 17.02.2010 | RO | 17.02.2010 | SE | 17.02.2010 | SI | 17.02.2010 | SK | 17.02.2010 | TR | 17.02.2010 | AT | 20.03.2010 | LU | 20.03.2010 | BE | 31.03.2010 | CH | 31.03.2010 | LI | 31.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | BG | 17.05.2010 | GB | 17.05.2010 | GR | 18.05.2010 | ES | 28.05.2010 | PT | 17.06.2010 | HU | 18.08.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | CY | 17.02.2010 | |
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
AT | 20.03.2010 | ||
LU | 20.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GB | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
HU | 18.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 17.02.2010 | |
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
AT | 20.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GB | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
HU | 18.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/43] | CY | 17.02.2010 | |
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
AT | 20.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GB | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CY | 17.02.2010 | |
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GB | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | CY | 17.02.2010 | |
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
IT | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | CY | 17.02.2010 | |
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | CY | 17.02.2010 | |
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
DK | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | CY | 17.02.2010 | |
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 17.05.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | CY | 17.02.2010 | |
CZ | 17.02.2010 | ||
EE | 17.02.2010 | ||
FI | 17.02.2010 | ||
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
RO | 17.02.2010 | ||
SE | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
SK | 17.02.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | FI | 17.02.2010 | |
IE | 17.02.2010 | ||
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
GR | 18.05.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | FI | 17.02.2010 | |
NL | 17.02.2010 | ||
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | FI | 17.02.2010 | |
PL | 17.02.2010 | ||
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | PL | 17.02.2010 | |
SI | 17.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.05.2010 | ||
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | ES | 28.05.2010 | |
PT | 17.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | ES | 28.05.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0508580 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) [A] 1,11,16 * column 2, line 5 - line 42; figure 1 *; | [X]DE19738796 (KIEKERT AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,8-12 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19823580 (KIEKERT AG [DE]) [A] 16,20 * figures 1-4 *; | [XA]US6189267 (STASER BRIAN HALE [US]) [X] 1,5,10 * the whole document * [A] 16; | [A]EP1101891 (STRATTEC SECURITY CORP [US]) [A] 16 * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0069]; figures 21,22 *; | [X]DE10032499 (VALEO GMBH & CO SCHLIESSYST KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,8,9,11,12 * the whole document *; | [X]DE10048706 (VALEO GMBH & CO SCHLIESSYST KG [DE]) [X] 1,5,8,9,11-13 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10221399 (AISIN SEIKI [JP]) [A] 21* abstract * |