Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
09.11.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] |
14.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] |
12.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.02.2007 [2007/07] |
20.01.2006 | (Expected) grant | published on 08.03.2006 [2006/10] |
13.12.2005 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
13.12.2005 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
22.11.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.09.2005 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
14.05.2005 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
11.03.2005 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
11.03.2005 | Deletion: Reply to examination report | |
18.02.2005 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] |
01.02.2005 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
28.01.2005 | Definitive list of designations | published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] |
14.01.2005 | First examination report | |
10.01.2005 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
07.05.2004 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 23.06.2004 [2004/26] |
07.05.2004 | Request for examination filed | published on 23.06.2004 [2004/26] |
06.04.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid |