Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003515484 | Global Dossier | 07.05.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19956469 | 24.11.1999 | EP0011033 | 08.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1527939 | Global Dossier | 29.07.2009 | B2 | EP1527939 | 28.06.2006 | B1 | EP1527939 | 04.05.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19956469 | 24.11.1999 | EP00989850 | 08.11.2000 | EP04007091 | 08.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1232067 | Global Dossier | 08.06.2005 | B1 | EP1232067 | 21.08.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19956469 | 24.11.1999 | EP0011033 | 08.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1431098 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2006 | B1 | EP1431098 | 23.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19956469 | 24.11.1999 | EP00989850 | 08.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0015777 | 31.12.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19956469 | 24.11.1999 | EP0011033 | 08.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2392144 | 22.07.2008 | C | CA2392144 | 31.05.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19956469 | 24.11.1999 | EP0011033 | 08.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50010532D1 | 14.07.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE19956469 | 24.11.1999 | EP0011033 | 08.11.2000 | DE50010532 | 08.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50012385D1 | 04.05.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE19956469 | 24.11.1999 | DE50012385 | 08.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50013097D1 | 10.08.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE19956469 | 24.11.1999 | DE50013097 | 08.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6904993 | 14.06.2005 | B1 | Priority number | Date | DE19956469 | 24.11.1999 | EP0011033 | 08.11.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0138119 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19956469 | 24.11.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19956469 | 31.05.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19956469 | 24.11.1999 | Type | Divisional application | EP1527939 | Type | Earlier application | EP1232067 |