Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7071583 | Global Dossier | 04.07.2006 | B2 | US2004189234 | 30.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003085598 | 26.03.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004297884 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003085598 | 26.03.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1462893 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2008 | A3 | EP1462893 | 29.09.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2003085598 | 26.03.2003 |