EP1462893 - Uniaxial drive unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKYO SEIMITSU CO., LTD. 7-1, Shimorenjaku 9-chome Mitaka-shi Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states TOKYO SEIMITSU CO., LTD. 7-1, Shimorenjaku 9-chome Mitaka-shi Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukasawa, Takashi Tokyo Seimitsu Co., Ltd. 7-1, Shimorenjaku 9-chome Mitaka-shi Tokyo / JP | [2004/40] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04007114.4 | 24.03.2004 | [2004/40] | Priority number, date | JP20030085598 | 26.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003085598 | [2004/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1462893 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1462893 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/409, G05B19/23 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
G05B19/409 (EP,US);
G05B2219/35457 (EP,US);
G05B2219/41105 (EP,US);
G05B2219/41337 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/40] | G05B19/23, G05B19/409 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/46] |
Former [2004/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Einachsige Antriebseinheit | [2004/40] | English: | Uniaxial drive unit | [2004/40] | French: | Unité d'entraînement uniaxiale | [2004/40] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/11] | 16.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS59175390 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 4* the whole document *; | [XA]US4695137 (JOERGENS REINHARD [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 7 * * column 2, line 47 - column 4, line 7 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 3; | [XY]EP0589808 (SOMAB SOCIETE ANONYME [FR]) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 35 * * column 5, lines 31-43 * * figure 6 * [Y] 3,4; | [X]GB2281237 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1-4 * page 4, line 12 - page 6, line 9 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US5684627 (GANSER MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 1, line 48 - column 3, line 15 * * figure 1 *; | [XA]US5886684 (MIURA MAKOTO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 1, lines 10-18 * * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 7 * * column 5, line 45 - column 7, line 27 * * column 9, line 1 - column 11, line 60 * * column 14, lines 17-62 * * figures 1,4 * [A] 3; | [DA]US6008552 (YAGOTO MITSUTOSHI [JP], et al) [DA] 2 * column 21, line 1 - column 22, line 56 * * figure 16 *; | [Y]US6029533 (NOETZEL RALF FRANK [DE]) [Y] 3,4 * the whole document * |