EP1579819 - Improved intraosteal dental implant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Straumann Holding AG Hauptstrasse 26d 4437 Waldenburg / CH | [2005/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mundwiler, Ulrich Hofmattweg 22 4456 Tenniken / CH | 02 /
Memmolo, Marcello Schulstrasse 31 4450 Sissach / CH | 03 /
Benthaus, Kati Bläsiring 47 4057 Basel / CH | [2005/39] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/45] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/39] | Modiano, Guido, et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04007245.6 | 25.03.2004 | [2005/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1579819 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1579819 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1579819 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
A61C8/0063 (EP,US);
A61C8/005 (EP,US);
A61C8/0069 (EP,US);
A61C8/0022 (EP,US);
A61C8/0054 (EP,US);
A61C8/0056 (EP,US);
A61C8/0077 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/39] | Title | German: | Verbessertes enossales Dentalimplantat | [2005/39] | English: | Improved intraosteal dental implant | [2005/39] | French: | Implant dentaire intra-osseux amélioré | [2005/39] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 07.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.09.2008
15.09.2008
ADMISSIBLE Dentsply IH AB Aminogatan 1 431 21 Mölndal / SE Opponent's representative Somlo, Tommy Awapatent AB Södra Hamngatan 37-41 P.O. Box 11394 S-404 28 Göteborg / SE | [2012/47] |
Former [2010/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.09.2008
15.09.2008
ADMISSIBLE Astra Tech AB Aminogatan 1, P.O. Box 14 431 21 Mölndal / SE Opponent's representative Somlo, Tommy AWAPATENT AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 GÖTEBORG / SE | ||
Former [2008/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.09.2008
Astra Tech AB Aminogatan 1, P.O. Box 14 431 21 Mölndal / SE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 22.10.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 23.04.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.09.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.10.2010 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.10.2010 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 22.11.2012 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.11.2012 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 13.05.2013 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 06.12.2010 | Appeal received No. T2408/10 | 07.02.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.11.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 22.11.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.12.2012 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.12.2007 | BE | 12.12.2007 | CY | 12.12.2007 | CZ | 12.12.2007 | DK | 12.12.2007 | EE | 12.12.2007 | FI | 12.12.2007 | NL | 12.12.2007 | PL | 12.12.2007 | RO | 12.12.2007 | SI | 12.12.2007 | SK | 12.12.2007 | TR | 12.12.2007 | BG | 12.03.2008 | SE | 12.03.2008 | GR | 13.03.2008 | ES | 23.03.2008 | IE | 25.03.2008 | LU | 25.03.2008 | IT | 31.03.2008 | MC | 31.03.2008 | PT | 12.05.2008 | HU | 13.06.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CY | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
EE | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
TR | 12.12.2007 | ||
BG | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
IE | 25.03.2008 | ||
LU | 25.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
HU | 13.06.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CY | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
EE | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
BG | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
IE | 25.03.2008 | ||
LU | 25.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
HU | 13.06.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CY | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
EE | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
BG | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
IE | 25.03.2008 | ||
LU | 25.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CY | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
EE | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
BG | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
IE | 25.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
EE | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
BG | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
IE | 25.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
EE | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
GR | 13.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
IE | 25.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
IE | 25.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
DK | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
PT | 12.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
BE | 12.12.2007 | ||
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
RO | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SK | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
CZ | 12.12.2007 | ||
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
ES | 23.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 12.12.2007 | |
FI | 12.12.2007 | ||
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | FI | 12.12.2007 | |
NL | 12.12.2007 | ||
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | FI | 12.12.2007 | |
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SI | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | FI | 12.12.2007 | |
PL | 12.12.2007 | ||
SE | 12.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0599794 (MEDEVELOP AB [SE]) [X] 1,3-5,8,10 * page 2, lines 1-6,55-57 * * page 4, lines 7,8,20,21; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0879580 (CORE VENT CORP [US]) [Y] 12 * figure 18 *; | [X]WO0150972 (ELIAN NICHOLAS [US]) [X] 1,6,7,9-11,19 * page 7, lines 23-25 * * page 8, line 29 - page 9, line 9 ** page 13, line 28 - page 14, line 4; figures 2-4B,8,11A,11B *; | [XY]US2003104337 (COTTRELL RICHARD DAY [US]) [X] 1-7,18,19 * page 3, paragraph 42 * * page 4, paragraphs 46,48,49; figures 9,13,14 * [Y] 12 | Examination | US6280194 | Opposition | EP0599794 | US5759034 | WO0150972 | US6280194 | US6527554 |