EP1463135 - Fuel cell system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morita, Koji 257-4-205 Yatsu-cho Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2013/01] |
Former [2004/40] | 01 /
Morita, Koji 257-4-205 Yatsu-cho Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/40] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04007257.1 | 25.03.2004 | [2004/40] | Priority number, date | JP20030089092 | 27.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003089092 | [2004/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1463135 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1463135 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/02, H01M8/04 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
H01M8/04067 (EP,US);
H01M8/04007 (EP,US);
H01M8/04089 (EP,US);
H01M8/04126 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/24] |
Former [2004/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Brennstoffzellensystem | [2004/40] | English: | Fuel cell system | [2004/40] | French: | Système des piles à combustible | [2004/40] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 08.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.12.2005 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5360679 (BUSWELL RICHARD F [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * column 6, line 25 - column 11, line 17; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]US5573867 (ZAFRED PAOLO R [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * column 11, line 14 - column 12, line 28; figure 9; claims 1-25 * * column 11 - column 13 * [Y] 2-8; | [XY]WO9829918 (ZTEK CORP [US]) [X] 1,9 * page 6, line 25 - page 7, line 11 * * page 16, line 14 - page 17, line 37; figures 1,8 * [Y] 2-8; | [A]US2001021468 (KANAI YASUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9* page 10, paragraph 217 - page 13, paragraph 243; figures 1,15-17,19-21,26 *; | [A]US2002006537 (KOBAYASHI TOMOKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 7, line 49 - column 9, line 49; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]WO0239514 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [Y] 1-9 * page 8, line 13 - page 13, line 11; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US6528193 (KURITA KENJI [JP]) [Y] 4,7 * page 2, paragraph 34 - page 3, paragraph 41; figures 1,5-7 *; | [Y]WO03021702 (INNOGY PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 1-9 * page 13, line 5 - line 35 * * page 14, line 4 - page 15, line 35 * * page 17, line 19 - line 34; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | US5360679 | US5573867 | WO9829918 | JP2002056865 | WO0239514 | WO03021702 |