EP1468655 - Locking bone plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRECIMED S.A. l'Echelette, 7 2534 Orvin / CH | [2004/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Young, Robert Allen 18 Heron Hill Drive Downingtown PA 19335 / US | 02 /
White, Patrick Michel 511 Price Street West Chester PA / US | 03 /
Khowaylo, Mike 4, Furman Court Mahwah, NJ 07430 / US | [2004/43] | Representative(s) | Mötteli-Mantelli, Novella Da Vinci Partners LLC Rathausgasse 1 9320 Arbon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | Mötteli-Mantelli, Novella Moettelli & Associés SARL St. Leonhardstrasse 4 9000 St. Gallen / CH | ||
Former [2004/43] | OK pat AG Chamerstrasse 50 6300 Zug / CH | Application number, filing date | 04007308.2 | 26.03.2004 | [2004/43] | Priority number, date | US20030457786P | 26.03.2003 Original published format: US 457786 P | US20030509706P | 08.10.2003 Original published format: US 509706 P | [2004/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1468655 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1468655 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | [2006/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1468655 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/80 | [2004/43] | CPC: |
A61B17/8014 (EP,US);
A61B17/8052 (EP,US);
A61B17/8057 (EP,US);
A61B17/8061 (EP,US);
A61B17/8095 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/43] | Title | German: | Blockierbare Knochenplatte | [2004/43] | English: | Locking bone plate | [2004/43] | French: | Plaque d'ostéosynthèse à bloquer | [2004/43] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 11.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.05.2008 | BE | 21.05.2008 | CY | 21.05.2008 | CZ | 21.05.2008 | DK | 21.05.2008 | EE | 21.05.2008 | FI | 21.05.2008 | IT | 21.05.2008 | NL | 21.05.2008 | PL | 21.05.2008 | RO | 21.05.2008 | SI | 21.05.2008 | SK | 21.05.2008 | TR | 21.05.2008 | BG | 21.08.2008 | SE | 21.08.2008 | GR | 22.08.2008 | ES | 01.09.2008 | PT | 21.10.2008 | HU | 22.11.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
IT | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
RO | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
BG | 21.08.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
GR | 22.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
HU | 22.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
IT | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
RO | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
BG | 21.08.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
GR | 22.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/40] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
IT | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
RO | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
BG | 21.08.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
RO | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
BG | 21.08.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
EE | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
RO | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
RO | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SK | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
BE | 21.05.2008 | ||
CZ | 21.05.2008 | ||
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
DK | 21.05.2008 | ||
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
PT | 21.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
SE | 21.08.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 21.05.2008 | |
FI | 21.05.2008 | ||
NL | 21.05.2008 | ||
PL | 21.05.2008 | ||
SI | 21.05.2008 | ||
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | SI | 21.05.2008 | |
ES | 01.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 21.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5709686 (TALOS GILBERT [CH], et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [X]WO02096309 (SYNTHES AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-4,7,12 * page 5, paragraph 4 - page 6, paragraph 6; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2002183752 (STEINER BEATRICE [CH], et al) [A] 1-4,7,12 * figures 1,4 * |