EP1462494 - Ink and ink set [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2006 [2006/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210, Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | For all designated states Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 210, Nakanuma, Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taguchi, Toshiki Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 200 Onakazato Fujinomiya-shi Shizuoka / JP | [2004/40] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/40] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04007466.8 | 26.03.2004 | [2004/40] | Priority number, date | JP20030085457 | 26.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003085457 | JP20030089231 | 27.03.2003 Original published format: JP 2003089231 | [2004/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1462494 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
C09D11/328 (EP,US);
C09D11/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/24] |
Former [2004/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Tinte und Tintensatz | [2004/40] | English: | Ink and ink set | [2004/40] | French: | Encre et ensemble d'encres | [2004/40] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 28.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.07.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/11] | 14.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.05.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2002105363 ; | [X]JP2001130126 ; | [X]US5482546 (EIDA TSUYOSHI [JP]) [X] 1-21 * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 62 * * abstract *; | [DX]WO9634916 (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [DX] 1-21 * page 1, line 24 - page 10, line 37 * * abstract *; | [X]EP0802246 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-21 * page 3, line 50 - page 8, line 4 * * abstract *; | [X]US5980623 (HIRAOKA EISUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1-21 * column 3, line 20 - column 3, line 50 * * abstract *; | [X]WO02064679 (CLARIANT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-21 * page 3, line 4 - page 6, line 23 * * abstract *; | [PX]EP1384762 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-21 * page 2, line 43 - page 4, line 11 * * abstract *; | [E]EP1403337 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-21 * page 2, line 38 - page 4, line 40 * * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020805), vol. 2002, no. 08, & JP2002105363 A 20020410 (MITSUBISHI CHEMICALS CORP) [X] 1-21 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010309), vol. 2000, no. 22, & JP2001130126 A 20010515 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1-21 * abstract * |