EP1464449 - Power tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2011 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.03.2011 [2011/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Makita Corporation 3-11-8, Sumiyoshi-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken 446-8502 / JP | [2010/12] |
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states MAKITA CORPORATION 3-11-8, Sumiyoshi-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken, 446-8502 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aoki, Yonosuke c/o Makita Corporation 3-11-8 Sumiyoshi-cho Anjo-shi Aichi-ken 446-8502 / JP | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Schmidtchen, Jürgen Christian Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | Schmidtchen, Jürgen Kramer Barske Schmidtchen, European Patent Attorneys Patenta Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04007681.2 | 30.03.2004 | [2004/41] | Priority number, date | JP20030098296 | 01.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003098296 | JP20040017688 | 26.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004017688 | [2004/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1464449 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1464449 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | [2007/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1464449 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B25D11/12, B25D17/24 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
B25D17/245 (EP,US);
B25D11/125 (EP,US);
B25D2211/003 (EP,US);
B25D2217/0084 (EP,US);
B25D2217/0092 (EP,US);
B25D2250/231 (EP,US);
B25D2250/371 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/46] |
Former [2004/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kraftwerkzeug | [2004/41] | English: | Power tool | [2004/41] | French: | Outil électrique | [2004/41] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 04.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.10.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2875731 (SETTLES JAMES C, et al) [X] 1 * column 1, line 15 - column 4, line 31; figures 1,2 * [Y] 7; | [DXY]JPS52109673 (HITACHI KOKI KK) [DX] 1,6 * abstract * [Y] 7; | [A]EP0066779 (HILTI AG [LI]) [A] 1,4 * page 6, line 27 - page 8, line 7; figure 2 *; | [X]US4460051 (WIDMER DIETER [CH]) [X] 1,4 * column 1, line 58 - column 5, line 13; figure 1 *; | [A]DE8708167U (ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, 7000 STUTTGART, DE) [A] 1,4 * page 3, lines 3-32; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE19843642 (WACKER WERKE KG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 11 - column 7, line 4; figures 1-9 *; | [A]WO03024672 (WACKER WERKE KG [DE], et al) [A] 1,8,21* page 8, line 7 - page 14, line 19; figures 1-5b * |