|
09.06.2020 |
Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.07.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.07.2014 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2014 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.05.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.05.2014 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
16 |
|
15.05.2014 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.04.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.04.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.04.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.04.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
15.04.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.04.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.04.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
14.04.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.04.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.04.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.04.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.04.2014 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.04.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.04.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.04.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
02.04.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
11.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.11.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.10.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.10.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.10.2013 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.10.2013 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2013 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.09.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.09.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.03.2013 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.02.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2013 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.01.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.01.2013 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2012 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.11.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2012 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.11.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
11.09.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.09.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.08.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
23 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2012 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.07.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.07.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.06.2012 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2012 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.06.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.06.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
11 |
|
19.06.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2012 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2011 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.12.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.12.2011 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.10.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
30.09.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.09.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
07.07.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.07.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.07.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.07.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.06.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.06.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.06.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.06.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.06.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.01.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.12.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.12.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.12.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.12.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.12.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
14.12.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
14.12.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.12.2010 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2010 |
General enquiry |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
14 |
|
16.06.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
15.06.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.06.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.06.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.06.2010 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.06.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
14 |
|
16.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.11.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
17.02.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
11.02.2009 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
09.02.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
09.02.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.02.2009 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.02.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
09.02.2009 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2008 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
14.10.2008 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
11.06.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2008 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2008 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2008 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2008 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2008 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
22 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
40 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
18.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.04.2008 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2008 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2008 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.04.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.04.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
16.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
16.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
02.04.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.04.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.04.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.04.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2008 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
02.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
02.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
02.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
02.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
02.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
02.04.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
23.06.2007 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2007 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.2007 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2007 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.05.2007 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2007 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
01.02.2007 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2006 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2004 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2004 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2004 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2004 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2004 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2004 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.06.2004 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.04.2004 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2004 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2004 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
20.04.2004 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
06.04.2004 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2004 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |