11.07.2014 |
Revocation of patent |
published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] |
21.05.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
16.05.2014 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
16.10.2013 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
16.10.2013 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
16.11.2012 |
New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal |
|
07.09.2012 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
05.09.2012 |
New entry: Appeal number |
|
05.09.2012 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
20.07.2012 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] |
16.07.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked |
|
12.07.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
08.04.2011 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
09.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] |
28.08.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] |
24.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] |
12.06.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] |
13.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2009 [2009/12] |
06.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] |
16.10.2008 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
10.10.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] |
07.06.2008 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
23.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.06.2008 [2008/26] |
16.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.06.2008 [2008/25] |
02.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] |
25.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
25.04.2008 |
Opposition filed |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
18.04.2008 |
Opposition filed |
published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] |
08.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] |
25.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] |
15.06.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 18.07.2007 [2007/29] |
17.05.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
17.05.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
28.03.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.02.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.06.2005 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 20.07.2005 [2005/29] |
17.12.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.02.2005 [2005/05] |
17.09.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.11.2004 [2004/45] |