EP1466887 - Process for the synthesis of N-methyl-dialkylamines from secundary amines and formaldehyde [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2009 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.2009 [2009/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OXEA Deutschland GmbH Otto-Roelen-Strasse 3 46147 Oberhausen / DE | [2007/21] |
Former [2004/42] | For all designated states Celanese Chemicals Europe GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 111 61476 Kronberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lappe, Peter, Dr. Eickenhof 34 46539 Dinslaken / DE | 02 /
Springer, Helmut Holtener Strasse 50 46539 Dinslaken / DE | [2004/42] | Application number, filing date | 04007896.6 | 01.04.2004 | [2004/42] | Priority number, date | DE2003116375 | 10.04.2003 Original published format: DE 10316375 | [2004/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1466887 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07C209/28, C07C211/35, C07C211/08, C07C211/21, C07C211/27 | [2004/42] | CPC: |
C07C209/28 (EP,US);
H04M1/0249 (KR);
H04M1/0277 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C209/28, C07C211/07 (EP,US);
C07C209/28, C07C211/08 (US,EP);
C07C209/28, C07C211/21 (US,EP);
C07C209/28, C07C211/27 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, HU, IT [2005/27] |
Former [2004/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von N-Methyl-Dialkylaminen aus sekundären Dialkylaminen und Formaldehyd | [2004/42] | English: | Process for the synthesis of N-methyl-dialkylamines from secundary amines and formaldehyde | [2004/42] | French: | Procédé de préparation de N-methyl-dialkylamines à partir d'amines secondaires avec le formaldehyde | [2004/42] | Examination procedure | 13.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/23] | 16.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/13] | 04.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE80520 (W. ESCHWEILER) [X] 1-5 * example . *; | [X]DE287802 (FARBENFABRIKEN VORM FRIEDR. BAYER & CO.) [X] 1-5 * example 3 *; | [X] - F. F. BLICKE, F. B. ZIENTY, "Antispasmodics II", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1939), vol. 61, pages 93 - 95, XP002291315 [X] 1-5 * Experimental part, synthesis of compound No. 12 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja01870a030 | [X] - W. ESCHWEILER, "Ersatz von an Stickstoff gebundenen Wasserstoffatomen durch die Methylgruppe mit Hülfe von Formaldehyd", BERICHTE, (1905), vol. 38, pages 880 - 882, XP009034778 [X] 1-5 * the whole document * | [X] - J. PLÖCHL, "Ueber eine Reaction des Formaldehyds", BERICHTE, (1888), vol. 21, pages 2117 - 2119, XP009034275 [X] 1-5 * the whole document * |