EP1464510 - Stable area detection device of platen gap and recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/13] | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2004/41] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takeshita, Sanshiro Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
Yamaguchi, Kazuhiko Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 03 /
Sugimoto, Hiroyuki Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP | [2004/41] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/41] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04008107.7 | 02.04.2004 | [2004/41] | Priority number, date | JP20030100638 | 03.04.2003 Original published format: JP 2003100638 | JP20030343646 | 01.10.2003 Original published format: JP 2003343646 | [2004/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1464510 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1464510 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | [2005/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1464510 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B41J25/308 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
B41J25/308 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/41] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Erfassen einer stabilen Region eines Druckspalts und Aufzeichnungsgerät | [2004/41] | English: | Stable area detection device of platen gap and recording apparatus | [2004/41] | French: | Dispositif de détection d'une zone stable de l'espacement entre la tête d'impression et le cylindre d'appui et appareil d'enregistrement | [2004/41] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2005 | Examination requested [2005/44] | 17.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.03.2010 | BE | 31.03.2010 | CY | 31.03.2010 | CZ | 31.03.2010 | DK | 31.03.2010 | EE | 31.03.2010 | FI | 31.03.2010 | GR | 31.03.2010 | IT | 31.03.2010 | NL | 31.03.2010 | PL | 31.03.2010 | RO | 31.03.2010 | SE | 31.03.2010 | SI | 31.03.2010 | SK | 31.03.2010 | TR | 31.03.2010 | IE | 02.04.2010 | LU | 02.04.2010 | CH | 30.04.2010 | LI | 30.04.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | BG | 30.06.2010 | ES | 12.07.2010 | PT | 02.08.2010 | HU | 01.10.2010 | [2014/38] |
Former [2013/42] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
TR | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 02.04.2010 | ||
LU | 02.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
TR | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 02.04.2010 | ||
LU | 02.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 02.04.2010 | ||
LU | 02.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 02.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 02.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 02.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 02.04.2010 | ||
CH | 30.04.2010 | ||
LI | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 02.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 02.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
FI | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 31.03.2010 | |
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | PL | 31.03.2010 | |
SI | 31.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH01228876 ; | [A]EP0391829 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891211), vol. 013, no. 555, Database accession no. (M - 904), & JP01228876 A 19890912 (NEC CORP) [A] 1-8 * abstract * |