EP1471029 - Device comprising a movable door seal for a movable door panel in an elevator and an elevator comprising said device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/32] | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55, Postfach 175 6052 Hergiswil / CH | ||
Former [2004/44] | For all designated states INVENTIO AG Seestrasse 55, Postfach 175 CH-6052 Hergiswil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spiess, Peter A., Dipl. El.-Ing. Meggenhornstrasse 15 6045 Meggen / CH | 02 /
Augugliaro, Dario, Dipl. Masch.-Ing. Obergütschrain 6 6003 Luzern / CH | [2004/44] | Application number, filing date | 04008390.9 | 07.04.2004 | [2004/44] | Priority number, date | EP20030405293 | 25.04.2003 Original published format: EP 03405293 | [2004/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1471029 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1471029 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B66B13/30 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
B66B13/308 (EP);
B66B13/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/29] |
Former [2004/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung mit bewegbarer Türdichtung für einen verschiebbaren Türflügel einer Aufzugsanlage und Aufzugsanlage mit einer solchen Vorrichtung | [2004/44] | English: | Device comprising a movable door seal for a movable door panel in an elevator and an elevator comprising said device | [2004/44] | French: | Dispositif comprenant un joint mobile pour un panneau mobile de porte d'un ascenseur et ascenseur comprenant ce dispositif | [2004/44] | Examination procedure | 13.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/23] | 28.04.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.08.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.06.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.06.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4735293 (EVERHART LYNN R [US], et al) [AD] 1-14* abstract * |