EP1468919 - Method and apparatus for manufacturing cigarette packages [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co. KG) Siemensstrasse 10 27283 Verden / DE | [2004/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Focke, Heinz Moorstrasse 64 27283 Verden / DE | 02 /
Spöring, Heido Veern Diek 26 27283 Verden / DE | 03 /
Stiller, Martin Döhlberger Strasse 35 27283 Verden / DE | [2004/43] | Representative(s) | Bolte, Erich, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/43] | Bolte, Erich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04008404.8 | 07.04.2004 | [2004/43] | Priority number, date | DE2003118055 | 17.04.2003 Original published format: DE 10318055 | [2004/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1468919 | Date: | 20.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1468919 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65B61/20, B65B19/20 | [2004/43] | CPC: |
B65B61/20 (EP,US);
B65B19/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2005/28] |
Former [2004/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Zigarettenpackungen | [2004/43] | English: | Method and apparatus for manufacturing cigarette packages | [2004/43] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour fabriquer des paquets de cigarettes | [2004/43] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 28.12.2004 | Observations by third parties | 03.05.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 19.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06026572.5 / EP1759999 | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.05.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.05.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2650141 (TEXTIMA AG) [X] 1-3,9,10 * page 9, lines 22-25; figure 3 *; | [X]US4757667 (ELSNER BERTRAM F [US]) [X] 1-3,9,10 * column 2, lines 38-52; figures 1-4; claim 1 *; | [X]FR2619356 (SRAMAG [FR]) [X] 1-3,9,10 * page 5, lines 32-35; figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP0895946 (FOCKE & CO [DE]) [X] 1,2,9 * paragraph [0046]; figure 11 *; | [A]US2002056258 (DEUTSCH REINHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1,4-6,9-11 * abstract *; | [A]US6467621 (ISHIDA KOICHI [JP]) [A] 1,9* abstract * | Examination | JPH07267217 | DE19841526 | US2003010656 | other | JPH07267217 | DE19841526 | US2003010656 |