EP1512896 - Valve having knob with distinctive position indicator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BE Intellectual Property, Inc. 1400 Corporate Center Way Wellington, Florida 33414 / US | [2005/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hannah, Gary R. 6501 Millbrook Avenue Shawnee Kansas 66218 / US | 02 /
Cordero, Enrique A. 11700 Wedd St Apt. 3 Overland Park Kansas 66213 / US | [2005/10] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/10] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04008475.8 | 07.04.2004 | [2005/10] | Priority number, date | US20030654538 | 03.09.2003 Original published format: US 654538 | [2005/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1512896 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1512896 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16K37/00 | [2005/10] | CPC: |
F16K37/0058 (EP,US);
Y10T137/8225 (EP,US);
Y10T137/8275 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/48] |
Former [2005/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ventil mit Knopf zur Anzeige unterschiedlicher Positionen | [2005/10] | English: | Valve having knob with distinctive position indicator | [2005/10] | French: | Robinet ayant une poignée avec un indicateur de position distinctive | [2005/10] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/35] | 10.09.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.10.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.10.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3910308 (MACK PHILLIP R) [AD] 1,8 * figure - *; | [X]DE3902731 (HEIMEIER GMBH METALL THEODOR [DE]) [X] 1-6,8-13 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0702178 (CT IND ZAANDAM [NL]) [A] 1,4,8,11* column 5, line 47 - column 7, line 32; figure - *; | [X]US5806559 (TAKASAKA TSUTOMU [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,8-10,12 * column 5, line 24 - line 35; figure - * | by applicant | US3151598 | US3183885 | US3241515 | US3547071 | US3910308 | US5769118 |