EP1471030 - Drive pulley for elevators and it's manufacturing process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 6052 Hergiswil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | For all designated states Inventio AG Seestrasse 55 Postfach 6052 Hergiswil / CH | ||
Former [2004/44] | For all designated states INVENTIO AG Seestrasse 55, Postfach CH-6052 Hergiswil / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ammon, Urs Bergstrasse 52 6030 Ebikon / CH | 02 /
Bloch, Hanspeter Balzenhofweg 32 6033 Buchrain / CH | [2004/44] | Application number, filing date | 04008524.3 | 08.04.2004 | [2004/44] | Priority number, date | EP20030405278 | 22.04.2003 Original published format: EP 03405278 | [2004/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1471030 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1471030 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B66B15/04 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
B66B15/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/44] | Title | German: | Treibscheibe für aufzüge und deren herstellungsverfahren | [2004/44] | English: | Drive pulley for elevators and it's manufacturing process | [2004/44] | French: | Poulie d'entraînement pour élévateur et sa méthode de production | [2004/44] | Examination procedure | 13.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/23] | 31.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.07.2009 | CZ | 29.07.2009 | DK | 29.07.2009 | EE | 29.07.2009 | FI | 29.07.2009 | IE | 29.07.2009 | NL | 29.07.2009 | PL | 29.07.2009 | RO | 29.07.2009 | SE | 29.07.2009 | SI | 29.07.2009 | SK | 29.07.2009 | TR | 29.07.2009 | BG | 29.10.2009 | GR | 30.10.2009 | PT | 29.11.2009 | HU | 30.01.2010 | LU | 08.04.2010 | BE | 30.04.2010 | MC | 30.04.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | CY | 29.07.2009 | |
CZ | 29.07.2009 | ||
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
HU | 30.01.2010 | ||
LU | 08.04.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 29.07.2009 | |
CZ | 29.07.2009 | ||
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
HU | 30.01.2010 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 29.07.2009 | |
CZ | 29.07.2009 | ||
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | CZ | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/50] | CZ | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/49] | CZ | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CZ | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | CZ | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | DK | 29.07.2009 | |
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | FI | 29.07.2009 | |
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | FI | 29.07.2009 | |
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | FI | 29.07.2009 | |
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | FI | 29.07.2009 | |
SE | 29.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1042307 (WALTER OXE) [X] 1-8* figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE1120702 (WALTER OXE) [X] 1-8 * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 5 *; | [X]DE1162155 (POHLIG HECKEL BLEICHERT) [X] 1-8 * column 1, line 38 - line 43 * |