EP1480126 - Self-learning method and system for detecting abnormalities [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2004/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ashvinkumar Jayantilal Sanghvi 26521, SE 19th Court Sammamish, Washington 98075 / US | [2004/48] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/43] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/48] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04008594.6 | 08.04.2004 | [2004/48] | Priority number, date | US20030472512P | 22.05.2003 Original published format: US 472512 P | US20030685472 | 16.10.2003 Original published format: US 685472 | [2004/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1480126 | Date: | 24.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1480126 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | [2007/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1480126 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/07, // G06F11/34, G06F11/30 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
G06F11/3055 (EP,US);
G06F11/30 (KR);
G06F11/0754 (EP,US);
G06F11/3017 (EP,US);
G06F11/3082 (EP,US);
G06F11/3452 (EP,US);
G06F11/3409 (EP,US);
G06F11/3495 (EP,US);
G06F2201/83 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2004/48] | G06F11/07 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/48] | Title | German: | Selbstlernendes Verfahren und System zur Fehlererkennung | [2004/48] | English: | Self-learning method and system for detecting abnormalities | [2004/48] | French: | Méthode et système d'auto-apprentissage pour la détection d'anomalies | [2004/48] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 15.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.04.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.07.2008 | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.04.2004 | AT | 23.10.2013 | BE | 23.10.2013 | BG | 23.10.2013 | CY | 23.10.2013 | CZ | 23.10.2013 | DK | 23.10.2013 | EE | 23.10.2013 | ES | 23.10.2013 | FI | 23.10.2013 | IT | 23.10.2013 | MC | 23.10.2013 | NL | 23.10.2013 | PL | 23.10.2013 | RO | 23.10.2013 | SE | 23.10.2013 | SI | 23.10.2013 | SK | 23.10.2013 | TR | 23.10.2013 | GR | 24.01.2014 | PT | 24.02.2014 | IE | 08.04.2014 | LU | 08.04.2014 | CH | 30.04.2014 | LI | 30.04.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 08.04.2004 | |
AT | 23.10.2013 | ||
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
IE | 08.04.2014 | ||
LU | 08.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
IE | 08.04.2014 | ||
LU | 08.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
IE | 08.04.2014 | ||
LU | 08.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
IE | 08.04.2014 | ||
LU | 08.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
LU | 08.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
LU | 08.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/01] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
LU | 08.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 23.10.2013 | |
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 23.10.2013 | |
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5602761 (SPOERRE JULIE K [US], et al) [X] 1-44 * abstract * * column 1, line 28 - line 31 * * column 5, line 27 - column 6, line 7 * * column 9, line 16 - column 10, line 28 * * column 12, line 13 - column 17, line 40 * * figures 1,4 *; | [X]US6182022 (MAYLE GARY E [US], et al) [X] 1-44 * column A * * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 14 * * column 4, line 29 - column 6, line 33 * * column 8, line 66 - column 9, line 11 ** figures 1-4 *; | [X]WO03009140 (ALTAWORKS CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-44 * column A * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraphs [0040] , [0041] * * paragraph [0103] * * figures 1-4b,7,13,14 * | by applicant | US5602761 | US6182022 | WO03009140 |