EP1477453 - Reach type fork lift truck [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jungheinrich Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Ebert-Damm 129 22047 Hamburg / DE | [2004/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hüther, Sebastian, Dipl.-Ing. Kiefernweg 22 24568 Kaltenkirchen / DE | [2004/47] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2004/47] | Patentanwälte Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons, Schildberg Neuer Wall 41 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04008670.4 | 10.04.2004 | [2004/47] | Priority number, date | DE2003121569 | 14.05.2003 Original published format: DE 10321569 | [2004/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1477453 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B66F9/075, B66F9/10, B62D11/00, B60T8/24 | [2004/47] | CPC: |
B66F9/0755 (EP,US);
B66F9/07509 (EP,US);
G01P3/488 (EP,US);
B60W2300/121 (EP,US);
B60W2420/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/31] |
Former [2004/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schubmaststapler | [2004/47] | English: | Reach type fork lift truck | [2004/47] | French: | Chariot élévateur à fourches à mât déplaçable | [2004/47] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/12] | 28.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]JP2003252597 ; | [Y]US5333706 (MORI MASATOMO [JP]) [Y] 4,6,7 * abstract * * column 3, line 40 - line 54 *; | [Y]US6027303 (VOEGELI RONALD C [US]) [Y] 5 * column 3, line 39 - line 43; figures 1-3 *; | [XY]EP1150124 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]) [X] 1-3 * page 7, column 12, line 11; figures 1-8,15,18-20 * * column 7, line 21 - line 36; figure 8 * * column 14, line 19 - line 29; figure 15 * * abstract * [Y] 4-7; | [PA]US2003152451 (NAGATA KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [PA] 1* abstract * | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2003252597 A 20030910 (NIPPON YUSOKI CO LTD) [PX] 1 * abstract * |