Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100698671B | Global Dossier | 23.03.2007 | B1 | KR20060046669 | 17.05.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | EP04008682 | 10.04.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1584716 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP04008682 | 10.04.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1680641 | 12.10.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | EP04008682 | 10.04.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI286169B | 01.09.2007 | B | TW200609394 | 16.03.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | EP04008682 | 10.04.2004 |