EP1584716 - Yarn treatment process and machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schärer Schweiter Mettler AG Neugasse 10 8812 Horgen / CH | [2005/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maccabruni, Davide Murwiesenstrasse 23 8057 Zürich / CH | 02 /
Schaad, Marc Heidenburgweg 20 5600 Lenzburg / CH | [2005/41] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2005/41] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 04008682.9 | 10.04.2004 | [2005/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1584716 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | D02G1/02, D02G3/34 | [2005/41] | CPC: |
D02G3/34 (EP);
D02G3/00 (KR);
D02G1/02 (EP);
D02G1/024 (EP);
D02G1/0266 (EP);
D02G3/28 (KR);
D02G3/36 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, IT, LI, TR [2006/25] |
Former [2005/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Garnbearbeitungsverfahren und Garnbearbeitungsmaschine | [2005/41] | English: | Yarn treatment process and machine | [2005/41] | French: | Procédé de traitement de fil et machine | [2005/41] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 04.07.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.08.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK | 26.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 24.05.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 24.05.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000080532 ; | [A]EP0179276 (AKZO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0299131 (ERNAELSTEEN JEAN CHARLES [BE]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2000080532 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO, et al) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [X]EP1103641 (BARMAG BARMER MASCHF [DE]) [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document *; | [XD]EP1277860 (SSM AG [CH]) [XD] 1-5 * column 5, paragraphs 22-26; figures 2,3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000922), vol. 2000, no. 06, & JP2000080532 A 20000321 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO LTD; KONDO SHOTEN:KK) [A] 1-5 * abstract * |