EP1484449 - Device for separating and removing separable materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2007 [2007/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hans Huber AG Maschinen- und Anlagenbau Industriepark Erasbach A1 D-92334 Berching / DE | [2004/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kerl, Thomas Weihersdorfer Hauptstrasse 8 92360 Mühlhausen / DE | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | Bergmeier, Werner Canzler & Bergmeier Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | Bergmeier, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 04008815.5 | 14.04.2004 | [2004/50] | Priority number, date | DE2003125115 | 02.06.2003 Original published format: DE 10325115 | [2004/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1484449 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1484449 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E02B8/02 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
E02B8/026 (EP,US);
B01D33/275 (EP,US);
B01D33/465 (EP,US);
B01D33/801 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/36] |
Former [2004/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Abscheiden und Abtransport von Abscheidegut | [2004/50] | English: | Device for separating and removing separable materials | [2004/50] | French: | Dispositif de séparation et de transport des matériaux séparables | [2004/50] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/15] | 08.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.08.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.08.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.08.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH348126 (PASSAVANT WERKE [DE]) [A] 10* figure 2 *; | [X]DE4016450 (STEINMANN & ITTIG GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-4 * figures 1,4-6 *; | [DX]DE4200366 (KLASNIC BRANKO [DE]) [DX] 1,4-7,9 * figures 1-3 *; | [X]WO9924680 (ANDRITZ PATENTVERWALTUNG [AT], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6-9,11,15 * page 1, paragraph 1; figures 1,2a,2b,3,6 * * page 3, line 9 - line 30 * * page 4, line 14 - line 18 * * page 5, line 6 - line 11 *; | [X]GB2351457 (HEADWORKS INC [US]) [X] 1-7,9,11-13 * page 1, paragraph 1; figures 1,2,4-6 * * page 9, line 1 - line 2 * * page 9, paragraph 2 * * page 10, paragraph 1 * * page 11, paragraph 3 * | by applicant | DE4200366 | EP0676227 |