EP1450025 - Negative pressure control apparatus and method therefore in an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/45] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsunooka, Takashi Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi, 471-8571 / JP | [2004/35] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/33] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/35] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04008867.6 | 30.04.2001 | [2004/35] | Priority number, date | JP20000132636 | 01.05.2000 Original published format: JP 2000132636 | [2004/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1450025 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1450025 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | [2004/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1450025 | Date: | 09.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60T17/02, F02D41/00, F02D41/06, F02P5/10 | [2004/40] | CPC: |
F02D41/062 (EP,US);
B60T13/52 (EP,US);
B60T17/02 (EP,US);
F02D41/0005 (EP,US);
F02P5/1504 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0406 (EP,US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/35] | F02D41/00, B60T17/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/35] | Title | German: | Unterdruckregelungsgerät und Verfahren in einer Brennkraftmaschine | [2004/35] | English: | Negative pressure control apparatus and method therefore in an internal combustion engine | [2004/35] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de contrôle de dépression dans un moteur à combustion interne | [2004/35] | Examination procedure | 14.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 22.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01110588.9 / EP1151902 | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS54135935 ; | [A]JPS60228771 ; | [A]JPS593174 ; | [A]JPS58107874 ; | [A]US4198937 (SUZUKI MOTOO [JP]) [A] 1,6 * column 1, line 21 - line 31 * * column 2, line 50 - line 59 * * column 3, line 30 - line 36 * * column 4, line 9 - line 12 * * column 4, line 49 - line L * * figures 1,4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19791225), vol. 003, no. 158, Database accession no. (M - 086), & JP54135935 A 19791022 (NISSAN MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1,6 * abstract * * figures 2,4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860409), vol. 010, no. 092, Database accession no. (M - 468), & JP60228771 A 19851114 (HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KK) [A] 1,6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840420), vol. 008, no. 087, Database accession no. (M - 291), & JP59003174 A 19840109 (SHIN NIPPON DENKI KK) [A] 1,6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830917), vol. 007, no. 211, Database accession no. (M - 243), & JP58107874 A 19830627 (NISSAN JIDOSHA KK;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1,6 * abstract * |