EP1445627 - Robust highly reflective optical construction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Avenue P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | ||
Former [2004/33] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road, AB-2B, PO Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saccomanno, Robert J. 22 Glenwood Drive Montville, NJ 07045 / US | 02 /
West, Gary A. 336 Brownsdale Road Butler, PA 16002-042 / US | [2004/33] | Representative(s) | Hucker, Charlotte Jane Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/33] | Hucker, Charlotte Jane Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 04008954.2 | 29.01.2002 | [2004/33] | Priority number, date | US20010264829P | 29.01.2001 Original published format: US 264829 P | US20010828065 | 04.04.2001 Original published format: US 828065 | [2004/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1445627 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1445627 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | [2004/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02B1/10, G02B1/04, B32B15/08, B32B17/10, B05D7/00 | [2004/33] | CPC: |
G02B6/02 (EP);
G02B1/14 (EP,US);
G02B1/105 (EP);
G02B6/02033 (EP);
G02B6/02395 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/33] | Title | German: | ROBUSTE, HOCHREFLEKTIERENDE OPTISCHE KONSTRUKTIONSEINHEIT | [2004/43] | English: | Robust highly reflective optical construction | [2004/33] | French: | CONSTRUCTION OPTIQUE ROBUSTE A HAUTE REFLEXION | [2004/43] |
Former [2004/33] | Robuste, hochreflektierende optische Konstruktionseinheit | ||
Former [2004/33] | Construction optique robuste à haute réflexion | Examination procedure | 12.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/23] | 10.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/04] | 29.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/04] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02706051.6 / EP1399312 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2007 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000071451 ; | [A]JPH04173848 ; | [A]US4225647 (PARENT RICHARD A) [A] 15 * abstract * * column 7, line 47 - line 68 ** column 9, line 12 - line 28; example 5 *; | [A]US4333985 (SHIRAHATA RYUJI, et al) [A] * example 2 *; | [X]EP0412242 (RHEYDT KABELWERK AG [DE]) [X] 12-14 * column 2, line 2 - line 24; figures 1,2; example 1 *; | [X]FR2700619 (AEROSPATIALE [FR]) [X] 12,13 * abstract * * page 3, line 8 - page 4, line 34 *; | [XD]EP0745872 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [XD] 12 * abstract * * column 22, line 51 - column 23, line 17 *; | [Y]US5589280 (GIBBONS KEVIN P [US], et al) [Y] 15 * abstract *; | [XY]US6140456 (LEE CHUNG J [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10,11 * abstract * * column 2, line 17 - line 29 * * column 22, line 60 - column 23, line 17 * [Y] 15; | [PX]US6261006 (SELFRIDGE RITCH ALLEN [US]) [PX] 12-14 * abstract * * column 4, line 7 - line 26 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000922), vol. 2000, no. 06, & JP2000071451 A 20000307 (KONICA CORP) [X] 1-6,10,11 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921006), vol. 016, no. 479, Database accession no. (C - 0992), & JP04173848 A 19920622 (TDK CORP) [A] 8 * abstract * |