EP1589244 - Driving unit with axially preloaded driving disc [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2008 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BorgWarner, Inc. 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2872 / US | [2008/37] |
Former [2007/40] | For all designated states BorgWarner Inc. 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | ||
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states BorgWarner Inc. 3850 Hamlin Road Auburn Hills MI 48326 / US | ||
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states BorgWarner Inc. 3800 Automation Avenue, Suite 100 Auburn Hills Michigan 48326-1782 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gerathewohl, Rainer Grünenwaldstrasse 44 76149 Karlsruhe / DE | [2005/43] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 04009398.1 | 21.04.2004 | [2005/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1589244 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1589244 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16D13/64, F16D13/62 | [2005/43] | CPC: |
F16D1/116 (EP,KR,US);
F16B21/18 (KR);
F16D13/64 (KR);
F16D13/644 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/27] |
Former [2005/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mitnehmereinheit mit axial vorgespannter Mitnehmerscheibe | [2005/43] | English: | Driving unit with axially preloaded driving disc | [2005/43] | French: | Dispositif d'entraînement avec plateau d'entraînement préchargé axiallement | [2007/28] |
Former [2005/43] | Dispositif d'entraînement avec plateau d'entraînement prechargé axiallement | Examination procedure | 04.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/14] | 18.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.08.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 31.05.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 31.05.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 03.10.2007 | IT | 30.04.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2009/03] | GB | 03.10.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE2125870 (ZF BORG WARNER GMBH) [X] 1-7 * figure -; claims 3,4 * [Y] 8,9; | [A]US6044948 (OKADA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1* figure 2 *; | [AY]EP1371867 (BORGWARNER INC [US]) [A] 1 * figure - * [Y] 8,9 |