EP1471330 - Re-routing apparatus and method for calculating an optimum alternative path to an original path from a position deviated from the original path in a navigation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/44] | Re-routing apparatus and method for calculating an optimum alternative path to an original path from a position deviated from the original path in a navigation system and a navigation system using the same | ||
[2009/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2010 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.11.2010 [2010/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
Former [2004/44] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nam, Joo-Hyun c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Jeon, Ji-Youn c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Choi, Yong-Ik c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Chon, Hae-Don c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2004/44] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/44] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04009574.7 | 22.04.2004 | [2004/44] | Priority number, date | KR20030025939 | 24.04.2003 Original published format: KR 2003025939 | [2004/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1471330 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1471330 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | [2006/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1471330 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/34, G08G1/0968 | [2004/44] | CPC: |
G08G1/096811 (EP,US);
G08G1/0968 (KR);
G01C21/3415 (EP,US);
G08G1/096827 (EP,US);
G08G1/096844 (EP,US);
G08G1/096861 (EP,US);
G08G1/096883 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/28] |
Former [2004/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und -verfahren zur Berechnung eines optimalen alternativen Weges zu einem ursprünglichen Weg von einer Position die von dem ursprünglichen Weg abweicht in einem Navigationssystem | [2009/26] | English: | Re-routing apparatus and method for calculating an optimum alternative path to an original path from a position deviated from the original path in a navigation system | [2009/26] | French: | Appareil et méthode pour calculer une route alternative optimum à une route originale d'une position déviée de la route originale dans un système de navigation | [2009/28] |
Former [2004/44] | Leitweglenkungsvorrichtung und -verfahren zur Berechnung eines optimalen alternativen Weges zu einem ursprünglichen Weg von einer Position die von dem ursprünglichen Weg abweicht in einem Navigationssystem und Navigationssystem mit Verwendung derselben | ||
Former [2004/44] | Re-routing apparatus and method for calculating an optimum alternative path to an original path from a position deviated from the original path in a navigation system and a navigation system using the same | ||
Former [2004/44] | Appareil et méthode de déplacement pour calculer un chemin alternatif optimum à un chemin original d'une position dévié du chemin original dans un système de navigation et un système de navigation l'utilisant | Examination procedure | 22.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/44] | 11.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0805336 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-24 * column 3, line 7 - line 13 * * column 9, line 46 - line 54 * * column 12, line 23 - column 16, line 58 * * figures 4,6,7 *; | [X]US6034626 (MAEKAWA KAZUTERU [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,14,15,22-24 * figures 12,13 ** column 9, line 40 - column 11, line 11 *; | [X]US6038509 (POPPEN RICHARD FREDERICK [US], et al) [X] 1-7,14,15,22-24 * column 6, line 4 - column 10, line 9 *; | [X]US6278942 (MCDONOUGH WILLIAM [US]) [X] 1-7,14,15,22-24 * figures 3,4 * * column 2, line 34 - column 4, line 59 * * column 7, line 29 - column 9, line 23 * |