Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100619813B | Global Dossier | 08.09.2006 | B1 | KR20050026666 | 15.03.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20030063398 | 09.09.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100556852B | Global Dossier | 10.03.2006 | B1 | KR20040103024 | 08.12.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20030034906 | 30.05.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7254479 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2007 | B2 | US2004254718 | 16.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20030034906 | 30.05.2003 | KR20030063398 | 09.09.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004361918 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20030034906 | 30.05.2003 | KR20030063398 | 09.09.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1482322 | Global Dossier | 08.06.2011 | B1 | EP1482322 | 09.11.2005 | A3 | EP1482322 | 01.12.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR20030034906 | 30.05.2003 | KR20030063398 | 09.09.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE512372T | 15.06.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | KR20030034906 | 30.05.2003 | KR20030063398 | 09.09.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100502565C | 17.06.2009 | C | CN1575002 | 02.02.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20030034906 | 30.05.2003 | KR20030063398 | 09.09.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EG24602 | 29.12.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20030034906 | 30.05.2003 | KR20030063398 | 09.09.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SA04250133 | 14.09.2008 | B1 | Priority number | Date | KR20030034906 | 30.05.2003 | KR20030063398 | 09.09.2003 |