EP1591369 - Collapsible drinking and storage receptacle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2007 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2007 [2007/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Theo A. Stewart-Stand 230 Park Place Brooklyn, N.Y. 11238 / US | [2005/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/44] | Representative(s) | Cohausz Hannig Borkowski Wissgott Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/44] | COHAUSZ DAWIDOWICZ HANNIG & SOZIEN Patentanwälte Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 04009829.5 | 26.04.2004 | [2005/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1591369 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B65D21/08 | [2005/44] | CPC: |
A45F3/20 (EP);
B65D21/086 (EP);
A45F2003/205 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/27] |
Former [2005/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zusammenklappbares Trink- und Aufbewahrungsgefäss | [2005/44] | English: | Collapsible drinking and storage receptacle | [2005/44] | French: | Récipient pliable pour boisson et stockage | [2005/44] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/06] | 29.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.06.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.06.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.06.2006 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2006 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH11227766 ; | [A]US3434589 (VALTRI FRANK J, et al) [A] 1,6 * column 2, lines 22-49 * * column 3, lines 14-34 * * figures 1,5 *; | [X]US5549196 (KASSMAN LEON B [US]) [X] 1-5,8,11 * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 4 * * column 3, lines 50-57 * * column 4, lines 13-17 * * figure 7 *; | [X]US2003160055 (STEWART-STAND THEO A [US]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10231259 (SOMMER IRA [DE]) [A] 1,10,14 * column 4, paragraphs 29-31 * * column 5, paragraph 37 ** figures 1-3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19991130), vol. 1999, no. 13, & JP11227766 A 19990824 (POLYMER SYSTEMS:KK; HOSOKAWA YOKO:KK) [A] 1,7,9,13 * abstract * |