EP1505781 - Multistage electro-optical switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.12.2006 [2006/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto CA 94306 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/06] | For all designated states Agilent Technologies, Inc. 395 Page Mill Road Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schroeder, Dale W. 1555 Tucker Road Scotts Valley, CA 95066 / US | [2005/06] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Roland Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/06] | Liesegang, Roland, Dr.-Ing. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04009857.6 | 26.04.2004 | [2005/06] | Priority number, date | US20030637241 | 07.08.2003 Original published format: US 637241 | [2005/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1505781 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56, H04Q11/00 | [2005/06] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0005 (EP,US);
H04L49/357 (EP,US);
H04L49/1515 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/43] |
Former [2005/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mehrstufige elektro-optische Vermittlungseinrichtung | [2005/06] | English: | Multistage electro-optical switch | [2005/06] | French: | Commutateur electro-optique à plusieurs étages | [2005/06] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/32] | 10.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/50] | 28.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5629925 (PFEIFFER BODO [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 3, line 32 - line 40 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 16 * * figure 1 *; | [X]EP0949837 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [X] 1-10* figures 2,6,7 *; | [X] - CHAO H J ET AL, "Centralized contention resolution schemes for a large-capacity optical ATM switch", ATM WORKSHOP PROCEEDINGS, 1998 IEEE FAIRFAX, VA, USA 26-29 MAY 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980526), ISBN 0-7803-4874-5, pages 11 - 16, XP010280499 [X] 1-10 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ATM.1998.675103 | [X] - HIRABAYASHI K ET AL, "OPTICAL BACKPLANE WITH FREE-SPACE OPTICAL INTERCONNECTIONS USING TUNABLE BEAM DEFLECTORS AND A MIRROR FOR BOOKSHELF-ASSEMBLED TERABIT PER SECOND CLASS ASYNCHRONOUS TRANSFER MODE SWITCH", OPTICAL ENGINEERING, SOC. OF PHOTO-OPTICAL INSTRUMENTATION ENGINEERS. BELLINGHAM, US, (19980401), vol. 37, no. 4, ISSN 0091-3286, pages 1332 - 1342, XP000771699 [X] 1-10 * figure 7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/1.601968 |